Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SB724 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/20/2025

                    II 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. 724 
To extend the temporary scheduling order for fentanyl-related substances 
for 6 months. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
FEBRUARY25, 2025 
Mr. B
OOKERintroduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred 
to the Committee on the Judiciary 
A BILL 
To extend the temporary scheduling order for fentanyl- 
related substances for 6 months. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representa-1
tives of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE. 3
This Act may be cited as the ‘‘Temporary Extension 4
of Fentanyl-Related Substances Scheduling Act’’. 5
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY ORDER FOR 6
FENTANYL-RELATED SUBSTANCES. 7
Section 2 of the Temporary Reauthorization and 8
Study of the Emergency Scheduling of Fentanyl Ana-9
logues Act (Public Law 116–114; 134 Stat. 103) is 10
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:18 Mar 13, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\S724.IS S724
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•S 724 IS
amended by striking ‘‘March 31, 2025’’ and inserting 1
‘‘September 30, 2025’’. 2
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 22:18 Mar 13, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\S724.IS S724
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS