Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SJR5 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/24/2025

                    IIA 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. J. RES. 5 
Directing the removal of United States Armed Forces from hostilities in 
Ukraine that have not been authorized by Congress. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
JANUARY23, 2025 
Mr. P
AULintroduced the following joint resolution; which was read twice and 
referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations 
JOINT RESOLUTION 
Directing the removal of United States Armed Forces from 
hostilities in Ukraine that have not been authorized by 
Congress. 
Whereas Congress has the sole power to declare war under 
the War Powers Clause of section 8 of article I of the 
Constitution of the United States; 
Whereas, since February 2022, Congress has appropriated 
nearly $183,000,000,000 in support of Ukraine; 
Whereas the United States actively provides Ukraine with 
real-time intelligence and targeting information and has 
done so throughout the duration of the Russo-Ukraine 
war; 
Whereas, on November 17, 2024, President Joseph R. Biden 
authorized Ukraine to use United States-provided Army 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:28 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SJ5.IS SJ5
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 
•SJ 5 IS 
Tactical Missile System (ATACMS) to strike targets in-
side Russia; 
Whereas United States forces contribute intelligence and tar-
geting information, which is provided via United States 
military satellites, global positioning systems, and other 
intelligence sources, for Ukraine to effectively use preci-
sion-guided munitions, including ATACMs, to strike tar-
gets inside Ukraine and Russia; 
Whereas, on November 19, 2024, Ukraine used ATACMS 
missiles to strike a weapons depot in Russia’s Bryansk 
region; 
Whereas, on November 23, 2024, Ukraine used ATACMS 
missiles to strike a S–400 air defense system in Russia’s 
Kursk region; 
Whereas, on November 25, 2024, Ukraine used ATACMS 
missiles to strike the Kursk-Vostochny Airbase in Rus-
sia’s Kursk region; 
Whereas, on October 2, 2024, Ukraine’s General Staff stated 
they used ATACMS missiles to strike a Russian Nebo- 
M radar system in an undisclosed location; 
Whereas, on December 11, 2024, Ukraine used ATACMS 
missiles to strike a military airfield in Russia’s Rostov re-
gion; 
Whereas, on December 18, 2024, Ukraine used ATACMS 
missiles to strike one of Russia’s largest chemical plants 
located in the Rostov region; 
Whereas, on January 2, 2025, Russian officials claimed to 
have intercepted 8 ATACMS missiles fired by Ukraine 
toward Russia’s Belgorod region; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:28 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SJ5.IS SJ5
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 
•SJ 5 IS 
Whereas Russian President Vladimir Putin stated that the 
United States decision to authorize Ukraine to strike 
Russia with United States-provided ATACMS would be 
‘‘tantamount to NATO directly entering the war. This 
will mean that NATO countries, the United States, and 
European countries, are fighting Russia.’’; 
Whereas, on November 19, 2024, President Putin signed a 
decree updating Russia’s nuclear doctrine to consider a 
conventional-weapons attack by a non-nuclear state that 
is supported by a nuclear-armed state as a joint attack 
on Russia, which could meet the conditions for a nuclear 
response; 
Whereas, on December 16, 2024, President-elect Donald J. 
Trump described President Biden’s decision to allow 
Ukraine to use United States-provided ATACMS to 
strike Russia as ‘‘a very stupid thing to do’’ and a ‘‘big 
mistake’’; 
Whereas, on November 1, 2022, Pentagon Spokesman Major 
General Pat Ryder confirmed that United States military 
personnel were deployed in Ukraine, stating, ‘‘These are 
personnel that are assigned to conduct security coopera-
tion and assistance as part of the Defense Attache Of-
fice.’’; 
Whereas documents from the Department of Defense, as well 
as current and former United States Government offi-
cials, indicate that, as of March 2023, a team of 14 
United States special forces operators were deployed to 
Ukraine; 
Whereas a former United States Government official told 
ABC News, ‘‘In addition to providing assistance with the 
oversight of U.S. equipment and supplies being sent to 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:28 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SJ5.IS SJ5
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 
•SJ 5 IS 
Ukraine, the team has assisted Ukrainian military plan-
ners with operations that have resulted in hundreds, if 
not thousands, of Russian military casualties.’’; 
Whereas, in November 2024, President Biden authorized 
United States military contractors to deploy to Ukraine 
to provide technical expertise for advanced weapon sys-
tems, reversing a long-standing policy preventing such 
deployments; 
Whereas section 8(c) of the War Powers Resolution (50 
U.S.C. 1547(c)) defines the term ‘‘introduction of United 
States Armed Forces’’ to include ‘‘the assignment of 
members of such Armed Forces to command, coordinate, 
participate in the movement of, or accompany the regular 
or irregular military forces of any foreign country or gov-
ernment when such military forces are engaged, or there 
exists an imminent threat that such forces will become 
engaged, in hostilities,’’ and activities that the United 
States Armed Forces have conducted in Ukraine fall 
within such definition, as is evidenced by United States 
support and coordination of Ukrainian precision strikes 
on Russian targets and United States special forces secu-
rity cooperation; 
Whereas the United States Armed Forces have been intro-
duced into active or imminent hostilities within the mean-
ing of section 4(a) of the War Powers Resolution (50 
U.S.C. 1543(a)), and activities that the United States 
Armed Forces have conducted in Ukraine fall within such 
definition, as evidenced by United States support and co-
ordination of Ukrainian precision strikes on Russian tar-
gets and United States special forces security coopera-
tion; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:28 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SJ5.IS SJ5
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 5 
•SJ 5 IS 
Whereas section 5(c) of the War Powers Resolution (50 
U.S.C. 1544(c)) states that ‘‘at any time that United 
States Armed Forces are engaged in hostilities outside 
the territory of the United States, its possessions and ter-
ritories without a declaration of war or specific statutory 
authorization, such forces shall be removed by the Presi-
dent if the Congress so directs’’; and 
Whereas section 1013 of the Department of State Authoriza-
tion Act, Fiscal Years 1984 and 1985 (50 U.S.C. 1546a) 
provides that ‘‘[a]ny joint resolution or bill [to require] 
the removal of United States Armed Forces engaged in 
hostilities . . . without a declaration of war or specific 
statutory authorization shall be considered in accordance 
with the procedures of section 601(b) of the International 
Security Assistance and Arms Export Control Act of 
1976’’: Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives1
of the United States of America in Congress assembled, 2
SECTION 1. REMOVAL OF UNITED STATES ARMED FORCES 3
FROM HOSTILITIES IN UKRAINE THAT HAVE 4
NOT BEEN AUTHORIZED BY CONGRESS. 5
Pursuant to section 1013 of the Department of State 6
Authorization Act, Fiscal Years 1984 and 1985 (50 7
U.S.C. 1546a) and in accordance with the provisions of 8
section 601(b) of the International Security Assistance 9
and Arms Export Control Act of 1976 (Public Law 94– 10
329; 90 Stat. 765), Congress hereby directs the President 11
to remove United States Armed Forces from hostilities in 12
or affecting Ukraine by not later than the date that is 13
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:28 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SJ5.IS SJ5
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 6 
•SJ 5 IS 
30 days after the date of the adoption of this joint resolu-1
tion (unless the President requests and Congress author-2
izes a later date), and unless and until a declaration of 3
war or specific authorization for such use of United States 4
Armed Forces has been enacted. 5
SEC. 2. RULE OF CONSTRUCTION REGARDING AUTHORIZA-6
TIONS FOR USE OF MILITARY FORCE. 7
Consistent with section 8(a)(1) of the War Powers 8
Resolution (50 U.S.C. 1547(a)(1)), nothing in this joint 9
resolution may be construed as authorizing the use of mili-10
tary force. 11
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:28 Jan 24, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00006 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SJ5.IS SJ5
ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS