Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR120 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/12/2025

                    III 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. RES. 120 
Recognizing Girl Scouts of the United States of America on its 113th birthday 
and celebrating its founder, Juliette Gordon Low, and the legacy of 
providing girls with a secure and inclusive space where they can explore 
their world, build meaningful relationships, and have access to experi-
ences that prepare them for a life of leadership. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
MARCH10, 2025 
Ms. D
UCKWORTH(for herself, Ms. COLLINS, Mrs. SHAHEEN, Mr. BARRASSO, 
Ms. H
ASSAN, Ms. CORTEZMASTO, Mrs. CAPITO, and Mr. KING) sub-
mitted the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
the Judiciary 
RESOLUTION 
Recognizing Girl Scouts of the United States of America 
on its 113th birthday and celebrating its founder, Juli-
ette Gordon Low, and the legacy of providing girls with 
a secure and inclusive space where they can explore 
their world, build meaningful relationships, and have ac-
cess to experiences that prepare them for a life of leader-
ship. 
Whereas March 12, 2025, marks the 113th anniversary of 
Girl Scouts of the United States of America, whose mis-
sion is to ‘‘build girls of courage, confidence, and char-
acter, who make the world a better place’’; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:06 Mar 11, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR120.IS SR120
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•SRES 120 IS 
Whereas Girl Scouts offers girls 21st century programming 
in science, technology, engineering, and math (STEM), 
the outdoors, entrepreneurship, and beyond, helping girls 
develop invaluable life skills through the Girl Scout Lead-
ership Experience; 
Whereas more than 50,000,000 women—trailblazers, vision-
aries, and leaders—are Girl Scout alums who embody the 
Girl Scout mission every day; 
Whereas the Girl Scout movement began on March 12, 1912, 
when Juliette ‘‘Daisy’’ Gordon Low, a native of Savan-
nah, Georgia, organized a group of 18 girls and provided 
them with the opportunity to develop physically, intellec-
tually, socially, and spiritually; 
Whereas public service and civic engagement were a corner-
stone of the life of Juliette Gordon Low, and they remain 
an important part of the Girl Scout experience, with pro-
gramming designed to encourage girls to learn about 
Federal, State, and local government, to research their 
elected officials and engage with those officials, and to 
become civically minded individuals equipped with the 
tools to make a positive change in the world; 
Whereas the commitment of the Girl Scouts to getting girls 
outdoors, including exciting summer camp experiences, 
comes from Juliette Gordon Low’s lifelong appreciation 
for nature and the environment; 
Whereas Juliette Gordon Low utilized her extensive network 
of friends across the country and around the world to es-
tablish the foundation of the Girl Scout movement, cre-
ating opportunities for girls to form lifelong friendships 
with fellow Girl Scouts; 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:06 Mar 11, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR120.IS SR120
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•SRES 120 IS 
Whereas Juliette Gordon Low, who served as the movement’s 
worldwide ambassador and the first Girl Scout Global 
Citizen, believed in the power of global connections and 
the ability of Girl Guides and Girl Scouts to positively 
impact their communities and the world; 
Whereas, on March 25, 2025, the Juliette Gordon Low Com-
memorative Quarter will be released into circulation by 
the United States Mint, celebrating the enduring legacy 
of the Girl Scout founder and the Girl Scout movement; 
and 
Whereas Juliette Gordon Low’s journey from trailblazing 
leader to a face on the currency of the United States is 
a testament to the power of girls and women everywhere: 
Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the Senate— 1
(1) recognizes Girl Scouts of the United States 2
of America for 113 years of building girls of cour-3
age, confidence, and character, who make the world 4
a better place; 5
(2) congratulates all Girl Scouts who earned the 6
Gold Award in 2024; 7
(3) commemorates the trailblazing founder of 8
Girl Scouts of the United States of America, Juliette 9
Gordon Low, for making her mark on the currency 10
of the United States; and 11
(4) encourages Girl Scouts of the United States 12
of America to continue to champion the ambitions, 13
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:06 Mar 11, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR120.IS SR120
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•SRES 120 IS 
nurture the creativity, and support the talents of fu-1
ture women leaders. 2
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:06 Mar 11, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR120.IS SR120
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB