III 119THCONGRESS 1 STSESSION S. RES. 60 Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Indian Affairs. IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES FEBRUARY5, 2025 Ms. M URKOWSKI, from the Committee on Indian Affairs, reported the fol- lowing original resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration RESOLUTION Authorizing expenditures by the Committee on Indian Affairs. Resolved, 1 SECTION 1. GENERAL AUTHORITY. 2 In carrying out its powers, duties, and functions im-3 posed by section 105 of Senate Resolution 4 (95th Con-4 gress), agreed to February 4, 1977, and in exercising the 5 authority conferred on it by that section, the Committee 6 on Indian Affairs (in this resolution referred to as the 7 ‘‘committee’’) is authorized from March 1, 2025, through 8 February 28, 2027, in its discretion, to— 9 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:31 Feb 06, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR60.IS SR60 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 2 •SRES 60 IS (1) make expenditures from the contingent fund 1 of the Senate; 2 (2) employ personnel; and 3 (3) with the prior consent of the Government 4 department or agency concerned and the Committee 5 on Rules and Administration, use on a reimbursable 6 or nonreimbursable basis the services of personnel of 7 any such department or agency. 8 SEC. 2. EXPENSES. 9 (a) E XPENSES FORPERIODENDINGSEPTEMBER30, 10 2025.—The expenses of the committee for the period 11 March 1, 2025, through September 30, 2025, under this 12 resolution shall not exceed $1,858,378, of which amount— 13 (1) not to exceed $50,000 may be expended for 14 the procurement of the services of individual consult-15 ants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by sec-16 tion 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 17 1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and 18 (2) not to exceed $20,000 may be expended for 19 the training of the professional staff of the com-20 mittee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 21 of that Act). 22 (b) E XPENSES FORFISCALYEAR2026 PERIOD.— 23 The expenses of the committee for the period October 1, 24 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:31 Feb 06, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR60.IS SR60 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 3 •SRES 60 IS 2025, through September 30, 2026, under this resolution 1 shall not exceed $3,185,791, of which amount— 2 (1) not to exceed $50,000 may be expended for 3 the procurement of the services of individual consult-4 ants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by sec-5 tion 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 6 1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and 7 (2) not to exceed $20,000 may be expended for 8 the training of the professional staff of the com-9 mittee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 10 of that Act). 11 (c) E XPENSES FORPERIODENDINGFEBRUARY28, 12 2027.—The expenses of the committee for the period Oc-13 tober 1, 2026, through February 28, 2027, under this res-14 olution shall not exceed $1,327,413, of which amount— 15 (1) not to exceed $50,000 may be expended for 16 the procurement of the services of individual consult-17 ants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by sec-18 tion 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 19 1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and 20 (2) not to exceed $20,000 may be expended for 21 the training of the professional staff of the com-22 mittee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 23 of that Act). 24 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:31 Feb 06, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR60.IS SR60 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 4 •SRES 60 IS SEC. 3. EXPENSES AND AGENCY CONTRIBUTIONS. 1 (a) E XPENSES OF THECOMMITTEE.— 2 (1) I N GENERAL.—Except as provided in para-3 graph (2), expenses of the committee under this res-4 olution shall be paid from the contingent fund of the 5 Senate upon vouchers approved by the chairman of 6 the committee. 7 (2) V OUCHERS NOT REQUIRED .—Vouchers shall 8 not be required for— 9 (A) the disbursement of salaries of employ-10 ees paid at an annual rate; 11 (B) the payment of telecommunications 12 provided by the Office of the Sergeant at Arms 13 and Doorkeeper; 14 (C) the payment of stationery supplies pur-15 chased through the Keeper of the Stationery; 16 (D) payments to the Postmaster of the 17 Senate; 18 (E) the payment of metered charges on 19 copying equipment provided by the Office of the 20 Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper; 21 (F) the payment of Senate Recording and 22 Photographic Services; or 23 (G) the payment of franked and mass mail 24 costs by the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper. 25 VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:31 Feb 06, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR60.IS SR60 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS 5 •SRES 60 IS (b) AGENCYCONTRIBUTIONS.—There are authorized 1 to be paid from the appropriations account for ‘‘Expenses 2 of Inquiries and Investigations’’ of the Senate such sums 3 as may be necessary for agency contributions related to 4 the compensation of employees of the committee— 5 (1) for the period March 1, 2025, through Sep-6 tember 30, 2025; 7 (2) for the period October 1, 2025, through 8 September 30, 2026; and 9 (3) for the period October 1, 2026, through 10 February 28, 2027. 11 Æ VerDate Sep 11 2014 03:31 Feb 06, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR60.IS SR60 ssavage on LAPJG3WLY3PROD with BILLS