Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR62 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/11/2025

                    III 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. RES. 62 
Authorizing expenditures by the Special Committee on Aging. 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
FEBRUARY6 (legislative day, FEBRUARY5), 2025 
Mr. S
COTTof Florida, from the Special Committee on Aging, reported the fol-
lowing original resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Rules 
and Administration 
RESOLUTION 
Authorizing expenditures by the Special Committee on Aging. 
Resolved, 1
SECTION 1. GENERAL AUTHORITY. 2
In carrying out its powers, duties, and functions im-3
posed by section 104 of Senate Resolution 4 (95th Con-4
gress), agreed to February 4, 1977, and in exercising the 5
authority conferred on it by such section, the Special Com-6
mittee on Aging (in this resolution referred to as the 7
‘‘committee’’) is authorized from March 1, 2025, through 8
February 28, 2027, in its discretion, to— 9
(1) make expenditures from the contingent fund 10
of the Senate; 11
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:33 Feb 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR62.IS SR62
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
•SRES 62 IS 
(2) employ personnel; and 1
(3) with the prior consent of the Government 2
department or agency concerned and the Committee 3
on Rules and Administration, use on a reimbursable 4
or nonreimbursable basis the services of personnel of 5
any such department or agency. 6
SEC. 2. EXPENSES. 7
(a) E
XPENSES FORPERIODENDINGSEPTEMBER30, 8
2025.—The expenses of the committee for the period 9
March 1, 2025, through September 30, 2025, under this 10
resolution shall not exceed $2,060,695, of which amount— 11
(1) not to exceed $1,500 may be expended for 12
the procurement of the services of individual consult-13
ants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by sec-14
tion 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 15
1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and 16
(2) not to exceed $1,500 may be expended for 17
the training of the professional staff of the com-18
mittee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 19
of that Act). 20
(b) E
XPENSES FORFISCALYEAR2026 PERIOD.— 21
The expenses of the committee for the period October 1, 22
2025, through September 30, 2026, under this resolution 23
shall not exceed $3,532,620, of which amount— 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:33 Feb 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR62.IS SR62
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
•SRES 62 IS 
(1) not to exceed $1,500 may be expended for 1
the procurement of the services of individual consult-2
ants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by sec-3
tion 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 4
1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and 5
(2) not to exceed $1,500 may be expended for 6
the training of the professional staff of the com-7
mittee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 8
of that Act). 9
(c) E
XPENSES FORPERIODENDINGFEBRUARY28, 10
2027.—The expenses of the committee for the period Oc-11
tober 1, 2026, through February 28, 2027, under this res-12
olution shall not exceed $1,471,925, of which amount— 13
(1) not to exceed $1,500 may be expended for 14
the procurement of the services of individual consult-15
ants, or organizations thereof (as authorized by sec-16
tion 202(i) of the Legislative Reorganization Act of 17
1946 (2 U.S.C. 4301(i))); and 18
(2) not to exceed $1,500 may be expended for 19
the training of the professional staff of the com-20
mittee (under procedures specified by section 202(j) 21
of that Act). 22
SEC. 3. EXPENSES AND AGENCY CONTRIBUTIONS. 23
(a) E
XPENSES OF THECOMMITTEE.— 24
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:33 Feb 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR62.IS SR62
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 4 
•SRES 62 IS 
(1) IN GENERAL.—Except as provided in para-1
graph (2), expenses of the committee under this res-2
olution shall be paid from the contingent fund of the 3
Senate upon vouchers approved by the chairman of 4
the committee. 5
(2) V
OUCHERS NOT REQUIRED .—Vouchers shall 6
not be required for— 7
(A) the disbursement of salaries of employ-8
ees paid at an annual rate; 9
(B) the payment of telecommunications 10
provided by the Office of the Sergeant at Arms 11
and Doorkeeper; 12
(C) the payment of stationery supplies pur-13
chased through the Keeper of the Stationery; 14
(D) payments to the Postmaster of the 15
Senate; 16
(E) the payment of metered charges on 17
copying equipment provided by the Office of the 18
Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper; 19
(F) the payment of Senate Recording and 20
Photographic Services; or 21
(G) the payment of franked and mass mail 22
costs by the Sergeant at Arms and Doorkeeper. 23
(b) A
GENCYCONTRIBUTIONS.—There are authorized 24
to be paid from the appropriations account for ‘‘Expenses 25
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:33 Feb 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00004 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR62.IS SR62
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 5 
•SRES 62 IS 
of Inquiries and Investigations’’ of the Senate such sums 1
as may be necessary for agency contributions related to 2
the compensation of employees of the committee— 3
(1) for the period March 1, 2025, through Sep-4
tember 30, 2025; 5
(2) for the period October 1, 2025, through 6
September 30, 2026; and 7
(3) for the period October 1, 2026, through 8
February 28, 2027. 9
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 02:33 Feb 07, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00005 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR62.IS SR62
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB