Us Congress 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress Senate Bill SR72 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/18/2025

                    III 
119THCONGRESS 
1
STSESSION S. RES. 72 
Affirming that Hamas cannot retain any political or military control in 
the Gaza Strip . 
IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES 
FEBRUARY11, 2025 
Mr. G
RAHAM(for himself, Mr. BLUMENTHAL, Mr. COTTON, Ms. ROSEN, Mrs. 
B
RITT, and Mr. FETTERMAN) submitted the following resolution; which 
was referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations 
M
ARCH13, 2025 
Committee discharged; considered and agreed to 
RESOLUTION 
Affirming that Hamas cannot retain any political or military 
control in the Gaza Strip . 
Whereas Hamas was established in 1987, with the Hamas 
Covenant stating ‘‘Israel will exist and will continue to 
exist until [it is] obliterate[d]’’ clearly signifying the in-
tent of Hamas to destroy the State of Israel, eradicate 
the Jewish population, and undermine peace and pros-
perity in the Middle East; 
Whereas, on October 8, 1997, the Secretary of State des-
ignated Hamas a foreign terrorist organization in accord-
ance with section 219 of the Immigration and Nationality 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:25 Mar 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00001 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6300 E:\BILLS\SR72.ATS SR72
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 2 
SRES 72 ATS 
Act (8 U.S.C. 1189) for their repeated support for acts 
of terrorism; 
Whereas, since 2007, Hamas has served as the de facto gov-
erning body in the Gaza Strip; 
Whereas, on October 7, 2023, Hamas— 
(1) launched an unprovoked attack against the State 
of Israel; 
(2) brutally murdered more than 1,200 innocent 
men, women, and children; 
(3) took more than 250 individuals hostage; and 
(4) injured thousands more individuals in the dead-
liest attack on the Jewish people since the Holocaust; 
Whereas the United States Government has concluded that— 
(1) ‘‘Hamas has received funding, weapons, and 
training from the Islamic Republic of Iran’’; and 
(2) ‘‘Iran provides up to $100,000,000 annually in 
combined support to Palestinian terrorist groups, includ-
ing Hamas’’; and 
Whereas Hamas has threatened to attack the State of Israel 
again and stated ‘‘We must teach Israel a lesson, and we 
will do this again and again. The Al-Aqsa Deluge [the 
name Hamas gave its October 7 onslaught] is just the 
first time, and there will be a second, a third, a fourth’’: 
Now, therefore, be it 
Resolved, That the Senate— 1
(1) affirms that Hamas cannot be allowed to 2
retain any political or military control in the Gaza 3
Strip; 4
(2) calls upon the President to use all economic 5
and diplomatic tools possible to halt all sources of 6
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:25 Mar 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00002 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6201 E:\BILLS\SR72.ATS SR72
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB 3 
SRES 72 ATS 
funding for Hamas from the Islamic Republic of 1
Iran and all other sources of revenue; and 2
(3) supports the State of Israel as it continues 3
to defend its sovereignty against attacks from 4
Hamas, the Islamic Republic of Iran, and all other 5
Iranian proxies. 6
Æ 
VerDate Sep 11 2014 01:25 Mar 14, 2025 Jkt 059200 PO 00000 Frm 00003 Fmt 6652 Sfmt 6301 E:\BILLS\SR72.ATS SR72
kjohnson on DSK7ZCZBW3PROD with $$_JOB