Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House of Representatives 2025 Bills & Legislation

US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR387

Introduced
5/6/25  
Expressing support for the designation of May 2025 as "National Asthma and Allergy Awareness Month".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR388

Supporting the designation of the first week of April as "Adolescent Immunization Action Week" and recognizing the importance of encouraging vaccination for adolescents and young adults to protect against serious illness.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR389

Introduced
5/6/25  
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Nurses Week, to be observed from May 6 through May 12, 2025.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR39

This resolution ranks Representative Celeste Maloy of Utah immediately after Representative Dale Strong of Alabama on the Committee on Appropriations.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR390

Introduced
5/6/25  
Recognizing National Foster Care Month as an opportunity to raise awareness about the challenges of children in the foster care system and encouraging Congress to implement policy to improve the lives of children in, or at risk of entering, the foster care system.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR391

Introduced
5/6/25  
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H. J. Res. 72) relating to a national emergency by the President on February 1, 2025.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR392

Introduced
5/6/25  
Expressing support for the designation of May as "National Bladder Cancer Awareness Month".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR393

Introduced
5/6/25  
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H. J. Res. 73) relating to a national emergency by the President on February 1, 2025.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR394

Introduced
5/6/25  
Expressing support for the designation of July 16, 2025, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR395

Introduced
5/7/25  
Establishing a "Bill of Rights" to support United States law enforcement personnel nationwide in their work to protect our communities.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR396

Introduced
5/7/25  
Expressing support for the designation of the week of May 4, 2025, through May 10, 2025, as "Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR397

Introduced
5/7/25  
Supporting the designation of May 8, 2025, as "National Scam Survivor Day".
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR398

Introduced
5/8/25  
Condemning Iran's failure to comply with its international nuclear obligations.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR399

Introduced
5/8/25  
Congratulating Gregg Popovich, former Head Coach of the San Antonio Spurs and the winningest head coach in National Basketball Association history, on his retirement.
US

Us Congress 2025-2026 Regular Session

Us Congress House Bill HR4

This resolution provides for the President to be informed that Rep. Mike Johnson of Louisiana has been elected as Speaker and Kevin McCumber has been elected as Clerk of the House of Representatives of the 119th Congress.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records