Utah 2023 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0415 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/07/2023

                    H.B. 415
LEGISLATIVE GENERAL COUNSEL
6 Approved for Filing: D.M. Cheung 6
6   02-07-23 1:01 PM    6
H.B. 415
1	DOULA SERVICES COVERAGE AMENDMENTS
2	2023 GENERAL SESSION
3	STATE OF UTAH
4	Chief Sponsor:  Ashlee Matthews
5	Senate Sponsor: ____________
6 
7LONG TITLE
8General Description:
9 This bill requires the Public Employees' Benefit and Insurance Program to cover doula
10services.
11Highlighted Provisions:
12 This bill:
13 <defines terms;
14 <requires coverage of doula services by the Public Employees' Benefit and Insurance
15Program;
16 <requires the program to report on its coverage of doula services to the Health and
17Human Services Interim Committee; and
18 <provides a repeal date.
19Money Appropriated in this Bill:
20 None
21Other Special Clauses:
22 None
23Utah Code Sections Affected:
24AMENDS:
25 63I-2-249, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2021, Chapter 64
26ENACTS:
27 49-20-422, Utah Code Annotated 1953
*HB0415* H.B. 415	02-07-23 1:01 PM
- 2 -
28 
29Be it enacted by the Legislature of the state of Utah:
30 Section 1.  Section 49-20-422 is enacted to read:
31 49-20-422. Coverage of doula services.
32 (1)  As used in this section:
33 (a)  "Doula" means an individual who:
34 (i)  provides information and physical and emotional support:
35 (A)  to a pregnant or postpartum individual; and
36 (B)  related to the pregnant or postpartum individual's pregnancy; and
37 (ii)  is certified by one or more organizations approved by the program.
38 (b)  "Qualified individual" means a covered individual who is:
39 (i)  within the state employees' risk pool; and
40 (ii) (A)  is pregnant; or
41 (B)  was pregnant within the past six months.
42 (2)  For a plan year that begins on or after July 1, 2023, and before July 1, 2026, the
43program shall cover services provided by a doula to a qualified individual.
44 (3)  The program may establish limits for coverage under Subsection (2), including
45limits based on:
46 (a)  the type or number of services provided; and
47 (b)  a qualified individual's physical or emotional condition.
48 (4)  The program shall report to the Health and Human Services Interim Committee on
49or before October 1 of each year regarding coverage provided under Subsection (2), including:
50 (a)  covered providers;
51 (b)  covered services;
52 (c)  provider payment rates;
53 (d)  covered-individual cost sharing;
54 (e)  total provider payments and covered-individual cost sharing; and
55 (f)  any indicators of whether doula services have:
56 (i)  reduced pregnancy or postpartum coverage costs; or
57 (ii)  improved pregnancy or postpartum care.
58 Section 2.  Section 63I-2-249 is amended to read: 02-07-23 1:01 PM	H.B. 415
- 3 -
59 63I-2-249.  Repeal dates: Title 49.
60 (1)  Subsection 49-20-420(3), regarding a requirement to report to the Legislature, is
61repealed January 1, 2030.
62 (2)  Section 49-20-422, regarding coverage for doula services, is repealed July 1, 2027.