Utah 2023 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0415 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/16/2023

                    1st Sub. H.B. 415
LEGISLATIVE GENERAL COUNSEL
6 Approved for Filing: D.M. Cheung 6
6   02-15-23  1:57 PM    6
H.B. 415
1st Sub. (Buff)
Representative Ashlee Matthews proposes the following substitute bill:
1	MATERNAL COVERAGE AMENDMENTS
2	2023 GENERAL SESSION
3	STATE OF UTAH
4	Chief Sponsor:  Ashlee Matthews
5	Senate Sponsor:  Luz Escamilla
6 
7LONG TITLE
8General Description:
9 This bill requires the Public Employees' Benefit and Insurance Program to cover
10pregnancy and childbirth services.
11Highlighted Provisions:
12 This bill:
13 <defines terms;
14 <requires coverage of pregnancy and childbirth services by the Public Employees'
15Benefit and Insurance Program, including:
16 Cdoula services;
17 Cservices by a licensed direct-entry midwife; and
18 Cservices at a free-standing birthing center;
19 <requires the program to report on its coverage of pregnancy and childbirth services
20to the Health and Human Services Interim Committee; and
21 <provides a repeal date.
22Money Appropriated in this Bill:
23 None
24Other Special Clauses:
25 None
*HB0415S01* 1st Sub. (Buff) H.B. 415	02-15-23 1:57 PM
- 2 - House Committee Amendments  2-16-2023 pf/dc
26Utah Code Sections Affected:
27AMENDS:
28 63I-2-249, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2021, Chapter 64
29ENACTS:
30 49-20-422, Utah Code Annotated 1953
31 
32Be it enacted by the Legislature of the state of Utah:
33 Section 1.  Section 49-20-422 is enacted to read:
34 49-20-422. Coverage of pregnancy and childbirth services.
35 (1)  As used in this section:
36 (a)  "Doula" means an individual who:
37 (i)  provides information and physical and emotional support:
38 (A)  to a pregnant or postpartum individual; and
39 (B)  related to the pregnant or postpartum individual's pregnancy; and
40 (ii)  is certified by one or more organizations approved by the program.
41 (b)  "Pregnancy and childbirth services" means services provided to a pregnant
42individual before, during, or shortly after childbirth:
43 (i)  by a doula for the services described in Subsections (1)(a)(i) and (ii);   º and » 
44  º [(ii) by a direct-entry midwife licensed under Title 58, Chapter 77, Direct-Entry
45Midwife Act, if the direct-entry midwife is engaged in the practice of direct-entry midwifery, as
46defined in Section 58-77-102; or
47 (iii)]  (ii) »   at a birthing center that:
48 (A)  is licensed under Title 26, Chapter 21, Health Care Facility Licensing and
49Inspection Act   º [; or]  , or accredited by the Commission for the Accreditation of Birth
49aCenters; and » 
50  º [(B) is accredited by the Commission for the Accreditation of Birth Centers.]  (B) may
50ainclude services by a direct-entry midwife licensed under Title 58, Chapter 77, Direct-Entry
50bMidwife Act, if the direct-entry midwife is engaged in the practice of direct-entry midwifery,
50cas defined in Section 58-77-102. » 
51 (c)  "Qualified individual" means a covered individual who is:
52 (i)  within the state employees' risk pool; and
53 (ii) (A)  is pregnant; or
54 (B)  was pregnant within the past six months.
55 (2)  For a plan year that begins on or after July 1, 2023, and before July 1, 2026, the
56program shall cover pregnancy and childbirth services to a qualified individual. 02-15-23 1:57 PM	1st Sub. (Buff) H.B. 415
- 3 - House Committee Amendments  2-16-2023 pf/dc
57 (3)  The program may establish limits for coverage under Subsection (2), including
58limits based on:
59 (a)  the type or number of services provided;   º [and] »   
60 (b)  a qualified individual's physical or emotional condition   º [.]  ; and
60a (c) conditions for provider participation. » 
61 (4)  The program shall report to the Health and Human Services Interim Committee on
62or before October 1 of each year regarding coverage provided under Subsection (2), including:
63 (a)  covered providers;
64 (b)  covered services;
65 (c)  provider payment rates;
66 (d)  covered-individual cost sharing;
67 (e)  total provider payments and covered-individual cost sharing; and
68 (f)  any indicators of whether pregnancy and childbirth services covered under
69Subsection (2) have:
70 (i)  reduced pregnancy or postpartum coverage costs; or
71 (ii)  improved pregnancy or postpartum care.
72 Section 2.  Section 63I-2-249 is amended to read:
73 63I-2-249.  Repeal dates: Title 49.
74 (1)  Subsection 49-20-420(3), regarding a requirement to report to the Legislature, is
75repealed January 1, 2030.
76 (2)  Section 49-20-422, regarding coverage for pregnancy and childbirth services, is
77repealed July 1, 2027.