Utah 2025 2025 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0185 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/13/2025

                    01-13 16:30  H.B. 185
1 
Railroad Modifications
2025 GENERAL SESSION
STATE OF UTAH
Chief Sponsor: Tyler Clancy
2 
 
3 
LONG TITLE
4 
General Description:
5 
This bill addresses emissions from railroad locomotives.
6 
Highlighted Provisions:
7 
This bill:
8 
▸ defines terms;
9 
▸ requires the Division of Air Quality (division) to conduct an inventory related to
10 
emissions from railyards in certain counties in the state;
11 
▸ requires the division to propose an emissions reduction plan for emissions from certain
12 
railroad locomotives to be implemented by December 31, 2027;
13 
▸ requires the division to recommend state action for implementing the emissions reduction
14 
plan; and
15 
▸ requires the division to report on the inventory, plan, and recommendations.
16 
Money Appropriated in this Bill:
17 
None
18 
Other Special Clauses:
19 
None
20 
Utah Code Sections Affected:
21 
AMENDS:
22 
63I-2-219, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2024, Third Special Session, Chapter 5
23 
ENACTS:
24 
19-2a-108, Utah Code Annotated 1953
25 
 
26 
Be it enacted by the Legislature of the state of Utah:
27 
Section 1.  Section 19-2a-108 is enacted to read:
28 
19-2a-108 . Railroad emissions study -- Emissions reduction plan -- Report.
29 
(1) As used in this section:
30 
(a) "Division" means the Division of Air Quality created in Section 19-1-105.
31 
(b) "Local yard service" means the same as that term is defined in Section 56-2-1.  H.B. 185	01-13 16:30
32 
(c) "Ozone nonattainment area" means an area that does not meet the primary or
33 
secondary air quality standards for ozone under the national ambient air quality
34 
standards described in 42 U.S.C. Sec. 7407(d).
35 
(d)(i) "Ozone nonattainment county" means a county in this state partially or wholly
36 
included in an ozone nonattainment area.
37 
(ii) "Ozone nonattainment county" includes:
38 
(A) Davis County;
39 
(B) Salt Lake County;
40 
(C) Tooele County;
41 
(D) Utah County; and
42 
(E) Weber County.
43 
(e)(i) "Railroad locomotive" means an engine-powered piece of equipment that:
44 
(A) operates on rails; and
45 
(B) is designed for moving a railroad engine or railroad car.
46 
(ii) "Railroad locomotive" does not include equipment:
47 
(A) designed for operation on a roadway;
48 
(B) powered by an engine or engines with a total power output of less than 750
49 
kilowatts or 1006 horsepower; or
50 
(C) operated for historical display or non-commercial use.
51 
(2) By no later than September 30, 2025, the division shall complete:
52 
(a) an air emissions inventory of all railyards located in an ozone nonattainment county
53 
for:
54 
(i) nitrogen oxides;
55 
(ii) carbon monoxide;
56 
(iii) particulate matter; and
57 
(iv) other compounds the division identifies for the inventory;
58 
(b) an emissions reduction plan to reduce the emissions of compounds described in
59 
Subsection (2)(a):
60 
(i) from railroad locomotives operating in railyards located in ozone nonattainment
61 
counties:
62 
(A) designed or used for local yard service; or
63 
(B) designed with a maximum output of less than 2300 horsepower; and
64 
(ii) to the following levels by no later than December 31, 2027:
65 
(A) for nitrogen oxides, 5.0 grams per brake horsepower-hour;
- 2 - 01-13 16:30  H.B. 185
66 
(B) for carbon monoxide, 2.4 grams per brake horsepower-hour; and
67 
(C) for particulate matter, 0.10 grams per brake horsepower-hour; and
68 
(c) recommendations for actions that the state should take to implement the plan
69 
described in Subsection (2)(b).
70 
(3) The division shall report to the Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment
71 
Interim Committee on or before the committee's November 2025 interim meeting:
72 
(a) the findings of the study described in Subsection (2); and
73 
(b) the division's recommendations for legislative action.
74 
Section 2.  Section 63I-2-219 is amended to read:
75 
63I-2-219 . Repeal dates: Title 19.
76 
(1) Section 19-1-109, Clean Air Support Restricted Account, is repealed July 1, 2024.
77 
(2) Section 19-2a-102.5, Emissions reduction plan study and recommendations, is repealed
78 
July 1, 2024.
79 
(3) Section 19-2a-108, Railroad emissions study -- Emissions reduction plan -- Report, is
80 
repealed July 1, 2028.
81 
Section 3.  Effective Date.
82 
This bill takes effect on May 7, 2025.
- 3 -