Vermont 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Vermont House Bill HCR057 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/03/2025

                    R-77 	Page 1 of 1 
2025 
 
VT LEG #382289 v.1 
No. R-77.  House concurrent resolution recognizing March 25, 2025 as National 
Medal of Honor Day in Vermont. 
(H.C.R.57) 
Offered by Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs 
Offered by Senators Clarkson, Major, and White 
Whereas, on December 21, 1861, President Abraham Lincoln signed Public 
Resolution 82, the original Medal of Honor legislation, providing for a Navy Medal of 
Valor, which Senator James W. Grimes of Iowa had introduced, and in 1862, President 
Abraham Lincoln extended its eligibility to U.S. Army personnel, and 
Whereas, the first recipients of the Medal of Honor were a group of soldiers known as 
Andrews’ Raiders, who led a daunting mission to cross Confederate lines and steal a 
train, and six of those soldiers were honored on March 25, 1863, and 
Whereas, during the Civil War, approximately 60 Vermonters were Medal of Honor 
recipients, and 
Whereas, the most unusual recipient was Willie Johnston, a young resident of the 
Northeast Kingdom community of Salem, now Derby, who, despite being only 11 years 
of age when he enlisted, was accepted as a drummer in Company D of the 3rd Vermont 
Volunteer Infantry Regiment, and 
Whereas, during the 1862 Peninsula Campaign, when Union forces failed to invade 
the Confederate capital of Richmond, Virginia, and were forced to flee down the Virginia 
peninsula, young Johnston proved to be the only drummer in his division to retain his 
instrument through the harrowing ordeal, and 
Whereas, on September 16, 1863, when Willie Johnston was only 13 years of age, 
U.S. Secretary of War Edwin Stanton presented him with this special medal, and he 
remains the youngest recipient to this day, and 
Whereas, other Vermonters have been awarded the Medal of Honor for their military 
valor, including during the Indian Wars (1), the Philippines Campaign (1), interim 
periods (2), World War II (3), and the Vietnam War (1), and 
Whereas, Congress established National Medal of Honor Day, which was first 
observed in 1991, “to foster public appreciation and recognition of Medal of Honor 
recipients,” now therefore be it 
Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives:  
That the General Assembly recognizes March 25, 2025 as National Medal of Honor 
Day in Vermont, and be it further 
Resolved: That the Secretary of State be directed to provide a copy of this resolution 
to the Green Mountain Base Submarine Veterans; to Robert Burke, Director of the 
Vermont Office of Veterans Affairs; and to Richard Lorenz, the President of the Vermont 
National Guard Library and Museum.