Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB1020 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/29/2024

                    LRB-5674/1
JK:cdc&cjs
2023 - 2024  LEGISLATURE  
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 1020
January 29, 2024 - Introduced by Representatives KATSMA, BORN, ALLEN,
ARMSTRONG, AUGUST, BEHNKE, BINSFELD, BRANDTJEN, DITTRICH, DONOVAN,
EDMING, GREEN, GUNDRUM, HURD, KRUG, KURTZ, MACCO, MAGNAFICI, MAXEY,
MELOTIK, MOSES, MURPHY, MURSAU, NEDWESKI, O'CONNOR, OLDENBURG,
PENTERMAN, PETRYK, PLUMER, RETTINGER, SCHMIDT, SCHRAA, SCHUTT, SNYDER,
SORTWELL, SPIROS, STEFFEN, TRANEL, WICHGERS, WITTKE, ZIMMERMAN and
SWEARINGEN, cosponsored by Senators MARKLEIN, LEMAHIEU, BALLWEG,
BRADLEY, CABRAL-GUEVARA, FELZKOWSKI, FEYEN, JAGLER, NASS, QUINN,
STROEBEL, TESTIN, WANGGAARD and TOMCZYK. Referred to Joint Committee on
Finance.
***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
AN ACT to repeal 71.06 (1), (1m), (1n) and (1p), 71.06 (1q), 71.06 (2) (a) to (h),
71.06 (2) (i), 71.06 (2) (j) and 71.06 (2e) (a) and (b); to amend 71.06 (1q) (intro.),
71.06 (2) (i) (intro.), 71.06 (2) (j) (intro.) and 71.06 (2m); and to create 71.06 (1r),
71.06 (2) (k), 71.06 (2) (L) and 71.06 (2e) (bm) of the statutes; relating to:
expansion of the second individual income tax bracket.
Analysis by the Legislative Reference Bureau
This bill expands the second individual income tax bracket as follows:
1. For single individuals, certain fiduciaries, and heads of households, the
current law tax rate of 4.40 percent applies to taxable income exceeding $14,320 but
not exceeding $112,500.  Under current law, as adjusted for inflation, the second tax
bracket for single individuals, certain fiduciaries, and heads of households applies
to taxable income exceeding $14,320 but not exceeding $28,640.
2.  For married persons filing a joint return, the 4.40 percent tax rate applies
to taxable income exceeding $19,090 but not exceeding $150,000.  Under current law,
as adjusted for inflation, the second tax bracket for married persons filing a joint
return applies to taxable income exceeding $19,090 but not exceeding $38,190.
3. For married persons filing separate returns the 4.40 percent tax rate applies
to taxable income exceeding $9,550 but not exceeding $75,000.  Under current law,
as adjusted for inflation, the second tax bracket for married persons filing separate
returns applies to taxable income exceeding $9,550 but not exceeding $19,090.
Under current law, there are four income tax brackets for single individuals,
certain fiduciaries, heads of households, and married persons, and the brackets are
1
2
3
4
5 - 2 -2023 - 2024  Legislature	LRB-5674/1
JK:cdc&cjs
 ASSEMBLY BILL 1020
indexed for inflation.  The rate of taxation under current law for the lowest bracket
for single individuals, certain fiduciaries, heads of households, and married persons
is 3.50 percent of taxable income.  The rate for the second bracket is 4.40 percent.
The rate for the third bracket is 5.3 percent.  And the rate for the highest bracket is
7.65 percent.
For further information see the state fiscal estimate, which will be printed as
an appendix to this bill.
The people of the state of Wisconsin, represented in senate and assembly, do
enact as follows:
SECTION 1.  71.06 (1), (1m), (1n) and (1p) of the statutes are repealed.
SECTION 2.  71.06 (1q) (intro.) of the statutes is amended to read:
71.06 (1q) FIDUCIARIES, SINGLE INDIVIDUALS, AND HEADS OF HOUSEHOLDS; AFTER
2012 TO 2023. (intro.)  The tax to be assessed, levied, and collected upon the taxable
incomes of all fiduciaries, except fiduciaries of nuclear decommissioning trust or
reserve funds, and single individuals and heads of households shall be computed at
the following rates for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012, and before
January 1, 2024:
SECTION 3. 71.06 (1q) of the statutes, as affected by 2023 Wisconsin Acts 19 and
...(this act), is repealed.
SECTION 4.  71.06 (1r) of the statutes is created to read:
71.06 (1r) FIDUCIARIES, SINGLE INDIVIDUALS, AND HEADS OF HOUSEHOLD; AFTER 2023.
The tax to be assessed, levied, and collected upon the taxable incomes of all
fiduciaries, except fiduciaries of nuclear decommissioning trust or reserve funds, and
single individuals and heads of households shall be computed at the following rates
for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2023:
(a)  On all taxable income from $0 to $14,320, 3.50 percent.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17 - 3 -2023 - 2024  Legislature
LRB-5674/1
JK:cdc&cjs
SECTION 4
 ASSEMBLY BILL 1020
(b) On all taxable income exceeding $14,320 but not exceeding $112,500, 4.40
percent.
(c) On all taxable income exceeding $112,500 but not exceeding $315,310, 5.30
percent.
(d) On all taxable income exceeding $315,310, 7.65 percent.
SECTION 5.  71.06 (2) (a) to (h) of the statutes are repealed.
SECTION 6.  71.06 (2) (i) (intro.) of the statutes is amended to read:
71.06 (2) (i) (intro.)  For joint returns, for taxable years beginning after
December 31, 2012, and before January 1, 2024:
SECTION 7.  71.06 (2) (i) of the statutes, as affected by 2023 Wisconsin Acts 19
and ... (this act), is repealed.
SECTION 8.  71.06 (2) (j) (intro.) of the statutes is amended to read:
71.06 (2) (j) (intro.) For married persons filing separately, for taxable years
beginning after December 31, 2012, and before January 1, 2024:
SECTION 9.  71.06 (2) (j) of the statutes, as affected by 2023 Wisconsin Acts 19
and ... (this act), is repealed.
SECTION 10.  71.06 (2) (k) of the statutes is created to read:
71.06 (2) (k)  For joint returns, for taxable years beginning after December 31,
2023:
1. On all taxable income from $0 to $19,090, 3.50 percent.
2. On all taxable income exceeding $19,090 but not exceeding $150,000, 4.40
percent.
3. On all taxable income exceeding $150,000 but not exceeding $420,420, 5.30
percent.
4. On all taxable income exceeding $420,420, 7.65 percent.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25 - 4 -2023 - 2024  Legislature	LRB-5674/1
JK:cdc&cjs
SECTION 11 ASSEMBLY BILL 1020
SECTION 11.  71.06 (2) (L) of the statutes is created to read:
71.06 (2) (L) For married persons filing separately, for taxable years beginning
after December 31, 2023:
1.  On all taxable income from $0 to $9,550, 3.50 percent.
2. On all taxable income exceeding $9,550 but not exceeding $75,000, 4.40
percent.
3. On all taxable income exceeding $75,000 but not exceeding $210,210, 5.30
percent.
4. On all taxable income exceeding $210,210, 7.65 percent.
SECTION 12.  71.06 (2e) (a) and (b) of the statutes are repealed.
SECTION 13.  71.06 (2e) (bm) of the statutes is created to read:
71.06 (2e) (bm)  For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2024, the
maximum dollar amount in each tax bracket, and the corresponding minimum dollar
amount in the next bracket, under subs. (1r) and (2) (k) and (L), shall be increased
each year by a percentage equal to the percentage change between the U.S. consumer
price index for all urban consumers, U.S. city average, for the month of August of the
previous year and the U.S. consumer price index for all urban consumers, U.S. city
average, for the month of August 2023, as determined by the federal department of
labor, except that the adjustment may occur only if the resulting amount is greater
than the corresponding amount that was calculated for the previous year.
SECTION 14.  71.06 (2m) of the statutes is amended to read:
71.06 (2m) RATE CHANGES. If a rate under sub. (1), (1m), (1n), (1p), (1q), (1r) or
(2) (k) or (L) changes during a taxable year, the taxpayer shall compute the tax for
that taxable year by the methods applicable to the federal income tax under section
15 of the Internal Revenue Code.
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15
16
17
18
19
20
21
22
23
24
25 - 5 -2023 - 2024  Legislature
LRB-5674/1
JK:cdc&cjs
SECTION 15
 ASSEMBLY BILL 1020
SECTION 15.0Nonstatutory provisions.
(1) INDIVIDUAL INCOME TAX WITHHOLDING TABLE ADJUSTMENTS. No later than July
1, 2024, the department of revenue shall update the individual income tax
withholding tables under s. 71.64 (9) to reflect the tax rates, brackets, and sliding
scale standard deduction that are in effect for taxable year 2024.  The adjustments
made under this subsection to the withholding tables shall take effect on July 1,
2024.
SECTION 16.0Effective dates.  This act takes effect on the day after publication,
except as follows:
(1) The repeal of s. 71.06 (1q), (2) (i) and (j), and (2e) (a) and (b) takes effect on
January 1, 2029.
(END)
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12