Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB1022 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/29/2024

                    LRB-5624/1
JK:cjs
2023 - 2024  LEGISLATURE  
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 1022
January 29, 2024 - Introduced by Representatives SCHUTT, KATSMA, KRUG, ALLEN,
ARMSTRONG, AUGUST, BEHNKE, BINSFELD, BORN, BRANDTJEN, DITTRICH,
DONOVAN, EDMING, GOEBEN, GREEN, GUNDRUM, HURD, KURTZ, MACCO,
MAGNAFICI, MAXEY, MELOTIK, MOSES, MURPHY, MURSAU, NEDWESKI, O'CONNOR,
OLDENBURG, PENTERMAN, PETRYK, PLUMER, RETTINGER, SCHMIDT, SCHRAA,
SNYDER, SORTWELL, SPIROS, STEFFEN, TRANEL, WICHGERS, WITTKE and
SWEARINGEN, cosponsored by Senators B ALLWEG, STROEBEL, BRADLEY,
CABRAL-GUEVARA, FELZKOWSKI, FEYEN, JAGLER, MARKLEIN, NASS, QUINN,
TESTIN, WANGGAARD and TOMCZYK. Referred to Joint Committee on Finance.
***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
AN ACT to amend 71.07 (6) (am) 2. d.; and to create 71.07 (6) (am) 2. e. of the
statutes; relating to: the married persons credit.
Analysis by the Legislative Reference Bureau
Under current law, married persons filing a joint income tax return may claim
an income tax credit equal to 3 percent of the earned income for a taxable year of the
spouse with the lower earned income, up to a maximum credit of $480.  This bill
increases the maximum credit amount to $870.
For further information see the state fiscal estimate, which will be printed as
an appendix to this bill.
The people of the state of Wisconsin, represented in senate and assembly, do
enact as follows:
SECTION 1.  71.07 (6) (am) 2. d. of the statutes is amended to read:
71.07 (6) (am) 2. d.  For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2000, and
before January 1, 2024, 3 percent of the earned income of the spouse with the lower
earned income, but not more than $480.
SECTION 2.  71.07 (6) (am) 2. e. of the statutes is created to read:
1
2
3
4
5
6
7 - 2 -2023 - 2024  Legislature	LRB-5624/1
JK:cjs
SECTION 2 ASSEMBLY BILL 1022
71.07 (6) (am) 2. e.  For taxable years beginning after December 31, 2023, 3
percent of the earned income of the spouse with the lower earned income, but not
more than $870.
(END)
1
2
3
4