Wisconsin Legislative Council AMENDMENT MEMO One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc Memo published: February 5, 2024 Contact: Scott Grosz, Principal Attorney 2023 Assembly Bill 371 Assembly Amendment 1 2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 371 2023 Assembly Bill 371 exempts tangible personal property from the tax on telephone companies under ch. 76, Stats. Under the bill, the exemption initially applies to assessments as of January 1, 2023. ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 1 Assembly Amendment 1 delays the initial applicability of the personal property tax exemption for telephone companies to first apply to assessments as of January 1, 2024. BILL HISTORY 2023 Assembly Bill 371 was introduced by Representative Steffen on July 27, 2023. On December 5, 2023, Representative Steffen offered Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Bill 371. On February 1, 2024, the Assembly Committee on Ways and Means recommended adoption of Assembly Amendment 1 on a vote of Ayes, 11; Noes, 0, and passage of Assembly Bill 371, as amended, on a vote of Ayes, 7; Noes, 4. For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. SG:jal