Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB461 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 5, 2024 	Contact: Scott Grosz, Principal Attorney 
2023 Assembly Bill 461 
Assembly Substitute 
Amendment 1 
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 461 
Under current law, any municipality that enacted a premier resort area tax prior to January 1, 2000 
may increase the tax rate for the area to a maximum of 1.25 percent.
1
 Additionally, current law specifies 
that premier resort area tax revenues must be used for infrastructure expenses. 2023 Assembly Bill 461 
increases the maximum allowable tax rate for these qualifying municipalities to 1.5 percent, and 
specifies that the proceeds from the tax generated by the increase in rate must be used for public safety 
expenses.  
ASSEMBLY SUBSTITUTE AMENDMENT 1 
For a municipality that enacted a premier resort area tax prior to January 1, 2000, Assembly Substitute 
Amendment 1 to Assembly Bill 461 specifies that proceeds from the tax may be used for either 
infrastructure or public safety expenses. As compared to Assembly Bill 461, the substitute amendment 
does not affect the maximum allowable premier resort area tax rate.   
BILL HISTORY 
2023 Assembly Bill 461 was introduced by Representative Dallman on September 28, 2023. On 
December 8, 2023, Representative Dallman offered Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 to Assembly Bill 
461. On February 1, 2024, the Assembly Committee on Ways and Means recommended adoption of 
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 and passage of Assembly Bill 461, as amended, on successive votes 
of Ayes, 10; Noes, 1.  
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
SG:jal 
                                                
1
 The municipalities that meet the requirements of this provision of current law are the City of Wisconsin Dells and the 
Village of Lake Delton.