Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB197 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
ACT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Prepared by: Margit Kelley, Principal Attorney 	December 19, 2023 
2023 Wisconsin Act 56 
[2023 Senate Bill 197] 
Audiology and Speech-Language 
Pathology Interstate Compact 
2023 WISCONSIN ACT 56 
2023 Wisconsin Act 56 ratifies and enters Wisconsin into the Audiology and Speech-Language 
Pathology Compact, which allows a licensed audiologist or speech-language pathologist in a compact 
member state to practice in another member state under a “compact privilege,” without obtaining a 
license to practice in the other state. A licensed audiologist or speech-language pathologist who holds a 
valid compact privilege may provide audiology or speech-language pathology services in the other state 
in person, or via telehealth. The act applies only to an applicant for a compact privilege, and does not 
affect requirements for Wisconsin licensure. 
Licensure 
To obtain a compact privilege, a licensed individual must apply to the state in which the person is 
seeking to provide audiology or speech-language pathology services. The applicant must be licensed in 
good standing in the person’s home state, and the home state’s licensure must meet certain minimum 
standards, as Wisconsin does. For an audiologist, this includes requiring a doctoral degree in audiology 
or an equivalent degree, passage of a nationally recognized examination, and completion of a 
supervised clinical practicum experience.
1
 For a speech-language pathologist, this includes requiring a 
master’s degree from a speech-language pathology program, passage of a nationally recognized 
examination, completion of a supervised clinical practicum experience, and completion of supervised 
post-graduate professional experience.  
Active duty military personnel and their spouses may designate a member state as a home state, if the 
individual has a current license in good standing in the member state. 
Regulatory Oversight 
While providing audiology or speech-language pathology services in person or via telehealth under a 
compact privilege, a licensed audiologist or speech-language pathologist must adhere to the laws and 
regulations of the member state in which the person is providing the services.
2
 The person is also 
                                                
1
 For an audiologist, the doctoral degree requirement applies to a person who has graduated on or after January 1, 2008. 
If a person graduated before that date, either a master’s degree or doctorate in audiology, or equivalent degree, will 
satisfy the degree requirement. Wisconsin has similarly required a doctoral degree to be licensed as an audiologist 
since January 1, 2010, and accepted a master’s degree in audiology before that date. [s. 459.24 (3), Stats.] 
2
 Two particular aspects of a person’s professional scope of practice are impacted when providing services under a 
compact privilege in another member state: working in a school and dispensing a hearing aid. [ASLP-IC, Audiology & 
Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact (ASLP-IC): An Overview (August 26, 2019).] First, if a member state 
requires an audiologist or speech-language pathologist to have a separate license or certification to work in a school, an 
audiologist or speech-language pathologist may only work in a school if the home state license also requires a separate 
credential to work in a school. Wisconsin requires a separate license for an audiologist or speech-language pathologist 
to work in a school. [s. 115.28 (7) (c), Stats.; and ch. PI 34, Wis. Adm. Code.] Second, if a member state requires an  - 2 - 
subject to that state’s regulatory authority, including disciplinary action against the person’s compact 
privilege in any member state. 
In addition, the act does all of the following: 
 Allows member states’ licensure boards to conduct joint investigations of licensed individuals and to 
issue subpoenas that are enforceable in other member states. 
 Creates a coordinated database and reporting system containing licensure, adverse action, and 
investigative information on all licensed individuals in member states.  
 Requires applicants for an initial license or compact privilege to be fingerprinted, and requires an 
applicant’s fingerprint cards to be submitted to the state Department of Justice and the Federal 
Bureau of Investigation for a criminal history background check. 
Insurance Coverage 
In addition to the compact’s provisions for state regulatory oversight, the act also addresses an aspect of 
insurance coverage. Under current law, subject to certain exemptions, the state’s health insurance 
mandates require a health insurance policy or governmental self-insured plan to provide coverage for 
hearing aids and cochlear implants, and related treatment, for a child who is certified as deaf or hearing 
impaired. The act specifies that an audiologist who holds a compact privilege may provide those 
covered services. However, preferred provider networks and other plan limitations may apply. [s. 
632.895 (16), Stats.] 
Governance of the Compact 
For governance of the compact, the act enters Wisconsin into the Audiology and Speech-Language 
Pathology Compact Commission, which includes two members of the licensure boards of each member 
state. One member must be an audiologist and the other must be a speech-language pathologist. The 
commission has various powers and duties granted in the compact, including overseeing the 
administration of the compact, enforcing the compact, adopting bylaws, promulgating binding rules to 
coordinate implementation and administration of the compact, and establishing and electing an 
executive committee.  
The act provides for dispute resolution among member states, and allows the commission to initiate 
legal action if a state defaults on its obligations under the compact. The act also permits a state to 
withdraw from the compact by repealing the statute authorizing the compact, to take effect six months 
after the effective date of the repeal. 
The compact may be amended by the member states, effective after enacted into the laws of all member 
states. 
Effective date: December 8, 2023 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
MSK:jal 
                                                
audiologist or speech-language pathologist to have a separate license to dispense a hearing aid, an audiologist or 
speech-language pathologist may only dispense a hearing aid if the home state also requires a separate license. 
Wisconsin does not require an audiologist to have a separate license to dispense a hearing aid, but does require a 
speech-language pathologist to obtain a license as a hearing instrument specialist to dispense a hearing aid. [ss. 
459.02, 459.20 (2) (b), and 459.22 (2) (b), Stats.]