Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB323 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 1, 2024 	Contact: Brian Larson, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Senate Bill 323 Senate Amendment 1 
2023 SENATE BILL 323 
Current law imposes a tax on the real and tangible personal property of a telephone company, subject to 
certain exemptions, as specified in the statutes. A “telephone company” means any person that provides 
telecommunications services to another person, including the resale of services provided by another 
telephone company. The bill creates an exemption from this tax for tangible personal property, 
beginning with assessments as of January 1, 2023. 
SENATE AMENDMENT 1 
Senate Amendment 1 modifies the exemption under the bill so that it first applies to assessments as of 
January 1, 2024. 
BILL HISTORY 
On June 7, 2023, Senator Bradley introduced the bill, and it was cosponsored by Representative 
Steffen. On December 4, 2023, Senator Bradley offered Senate Amendment 1. On December 20, 2023, 
the Senate Committee on Utilities and Technology recommended adoption of the amendment, and 
passage of the bill, as amended, on votes of Ayes, 5; Noes, 0. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
BL:ksm