Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB582 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: November 14, 2023 	Contact: Katie Bender-Olson, Principal Attorney, and  
                   Peggy Hurley, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Senate Bill 582 Senate Amendment 1 
2023 SENATE BILL 582 
2023 Senate Bill 582 modifies the definition of a person who may receive absentee ballots as an 
“indefinitely confined” voter. Under the bill, a person may apply, on an application form that is separate 
from any other application form, for that status for the purpose of voting absentee if he or she is 
indefinitely confined and cannot travel independently without significant burden because of frailty, 
physical illness, or a disability that is expected to last longer than one year.  
The bill additionally requires a person who applies for indefinitely confined voter status to provide 
proof of identification, if he or she is able to do so, and offers various means of complying with this 
requirement. The bill specifies that municipal clerks must remove the indefinitely confined status from 
a person who votes in person in any election or who fails to vote in a spring or general election for which 
he or she has received a ballot. Additionally, the bill requires the Wisconsin Elections Commission to 
facilitate the removal of the indefinitely confined status of each voter who applied for that status 
between March 12, 2020, and November 3, 2020.  
Under the bill, a voter whose indefinitely confined status is so removed must submit a new application 
for indefinitely confined status in order to continue automatically receiving absentee ballots. Under the 
bill, a person who makes a false statement for the purpose of qualifying as indefinitely confined may be 
fined not more than $1,000, imprisoned for not more than six months, or both. 
SENATE AMENDMENT 1 
Senate Amendment 1 requires municipal clerks to notify voters who have their indefinitely confined 
status removed because they applied between March 12, 2020, and November 3, 2020, to notify the 
voter of such removal within five days after the action is taken, if possible. 
BILL HISTORY 
Senate Amendment 1 was offered by Senator Knodl on November 9, 2023. On November 10, 2023, the 
Senate Committee on Shared Revenue, Elections, and Consumer Protection adopted Senate 
Amendment 1 on a vote of Ayes, 5; Noes, 0. The committee then passed Senate Bill 582, as amended, on 
a vote of Ayes, 3; Noes, 2. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
KBO:jal