Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB592 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 21, 2024 	Contact: Margit Kelley, Principal Attorney 
2023 Senate Bill 592 
Senate 
Amendment 1 
2023 SENATE BILL 592 
2023 Senate Bill 592 specifies that the Department of Health Services (DHS) must apply a 
reimbursement rate under the Medical Assistance (MA) program for complex rehabilitation technology 
(CRT) wheelchair repair and accessories that is equal to the maximum fee paid in Wisconsin under the 
federal Medicare program. 
SENATE AMENDMENT 1 
Senate Amendment 1 requires DHS to submit an annual report to the Legislature, beginning July 1, 
2025, on certain claims data. The claims data must include the total number of units, total number of 
claims, total number of claims per provider, average dollar amount of all paid claims, average dollar 
amount of claims paid per provider, total dollar amount paid per provider, and the number of repairs 
done per unit during the last year. The report must also include a calculation of the amount paid to the 
provider compared to the amount paid to the provider if the reimbursement were through MA fee-for-
service. 
The amendment also requires DHS to submit a report the Legislature by July 1, 2025, on certain 
supplier data. The supplier data must include the number of CRT suppliers certified as MA providers in 
Wisconsin as of December 31, 2024, compared to December 31, 2017, and the effect of 2017 Wisconsin 
Act 306
1
 on the access and availability of CRT for MA recipients. The report must also include an 
assessment as to whether the CRT payment rates are adequate to ensure patient access to CRT. 
Lastly, the amendment delays initial applicability of the reimbursement rate under the bill for a third-
party payer that contracts with DHS to provide health care under the MA program (such as a managed 
care organization) until a third-party payer’s contract with DHS is newly established, extended, 
modified, or renewed. 
BILL HISTORY 
The Senate Committee on Insurance and Small Business recommended passage of the bill on January 
11, 2024, on a vote of Ayes, 5; Noes, 0.  
Senator Testin offered Senate Amendment 1 on February 20, 2024. That same date, the Senate adopted 
the amendment and passed the bill, as amended, on voice votes. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
MSK:jal 
                                                
1
 2017 Act 306 established CRT as a separate MA benefit from the benefit for general durable medical equipment.