Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Senate Bill SB592 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
ACT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Prepared by: Margit Kelley, Principal Attorney 	April 3, 2024 
2023 Wisconsin Act 182 
[2023 Senate Bill 592] 
Medicaid Reimbursement for 
Complex Rehabilitation 
Technology Repair 
2023 Wisconsin Act 182 specifies that the Department of Health Services (DHS) must apply a 
reimbursement rate under the Medical Assistance (MA) program for complex rehabilitation technology
1
 
(CRT) wheelchair repair and accessories that is equal to the maximum fee paid in Wisconsin under the 
federal Medicare program. 
The act requires DHS to submit an annual report to the Legislature, beginning July 1, 2025, on the CRT 
wheelchair repair and accessories claims data. The claims data must include the total number of units, 
total number of claims, total number of claims per provider, average dollar amount of all paid claims, 
average dollar amount of claims paid per provider, total dollar amount paid per provider, and the 
number of repairs done per unit during the last year. The report must also include a calculation of the 
amount paid to the provider compared to the amount paid to the provider if the reimbursement were 
through MA fee-for-service. 
The act also requires DHS to submit a one-time report to the Legislature, by July 1, 2025, regarding 
general CRT supplier data. The report must describe the number of CRT suppliers certified as MA 
providers in Wisconsin as of December 31, 2024, compared to December 31, 2017, and the effect of 2017 
Wisconsin Act 306
2
 on the access and availability of CRT for MA recipients. The report must also 
include an assessment as to whether the CRT payment rates are adequate to ensure patient access to 
CRT. 
Effective date: March 24, 2024, except that the act applies to a third-party payer that contracts with 
DHS to provide health care under the MA program on the date a contract is newly established, 
extended, modified, or renewed on or after March 24, 2024. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
MSK:jal 
                                                
1
 CRT items are classified within Medicare as durable medical equipment that are individually configured for individuals 
to meet their specific and unique medical, physical, and functional needs and capacities for basic activities of daily 
living and instrumental activities of daily living identified as medically necessary. CRT includes complex rehabilitation 
manual and power wheelchairs, adaptive seating and positioning items, and other specialized equipment such as 
standing frames and gait trainers, as well as options and accessories related to any of these items. 
2
 2017 Wisconsin Act 306 established coverage for CRT as an MA benefit that is separate from the benefit for general 
durable medical equipment.