HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 14 (By Delegate Steele) [Introduced February 13, 2025; Referred to the Committee on Energy and Public Works then Rules.] Requesting the Division of Highways name Bridge Number: 41-077/00-043.59 (SB) (41A229), (37.78047, -81.22121) locally known as I-77 OVER CABELL RD, carrying IS 077 over WHITESTICK CRK/CABELL RD in Raleigh County, the "U.S. Navy SC1 Curtis Hatcher Memorial Bridge." Whereas, Curtis Hatcher lived a life worthy of remembrance; and Whereas, Curtis was born on August 8th, 1926, in Beckley, WV to Ludie Wills and V.C. Hatcher; and Whereas, Curtis joined the United States Navy on December 26th, 1944, and served in World War 2 in Europe where he attained the rank of Seaman 1st Class; and Whereas, Curtis was honorably discharged from the Navy on July 9th, 1946; and Whereas, Curtis returned home after his service and lived peacefully until his death on November 1st, 2013; therefore, be it Resolved by the Legislature of West Virginia: That the Division of Highways name Bridge Number: 41-077/00-043.59 (SB) (41A229), (37.78047, -81.22121) locally known as I-77 OVER CABELL RD, carrying IS 077 over WHITESTICK CRK/CABELL RD in Raleigh County, the "U.S. Navy SC1 Curtis Hatcher Memorial Bridge " and, be it Further Resolved, That the Division of Highways is hereby requested to have made and be placed signs identifying the bridge as the "U.S. Navy SC1 Curtis Hatcher Memorial Bridge," and, be it Further Resolved, That the Clerk of the House forward a copy of this resolution to the Commissioner of the Division of Highways.