West Virginia 2025 2025 Regular Session

West Virginia House Bill HCR61 Comm Sub / Bill

                    Committee Substitute

for

HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION 61

(By Delegates Pritt and Clay)

[Originating in the Committee on Energy and Public Works; Reported on March 13, 2025]

 

Requesting the Division of Highways name a portion of State Route 16, specifically beginning at the northern city limits of Gauley Bridge, West Virginia and continuing for a mile in Fayette County, the "U.S. Navy S1c Guy Harlow Waugh Memorial Road."

Whereas, U.S. Navy S1c Guy Harlow Waugh lived a life worthy of remembrance; and

Whereas, Guy was born April 13th, 1925, in Marting, West Virginia; and

Whereas, On November 2nd, 1943, Guy entered into active service in the United States Navy; and

Whereas, S1c Waugh served honorably until his discharge on January 19th, 1946, having earned the American Campaign Medal, the Asiatic-Pacific Campaign Medal, and the World War II Victory Medal; and

Whereas, After returning home, S1c Waugh would live a full life, taking on many roles, including serving as the Mayor of Gauley Bridge, West Virginia; and

Whereas, S1c Waugh would continue a life of service to his community before passing away on March 31st, 2007; therefore, be it 

Resolved by the Legislature of West Virginia:

That the Division of Highways is hereby requested to name a portion of State Route 16, specifically beginning at the northern city limits of Gauley Bridge, West Virginia and continuing for a mile in Fayette County, the "U.S. Navy S1c Guy Harlow Waugh Memorial Road"; and, be it 

Further Resolved, That the Division of Highways is hereby requested to have made and be placed signs at both ends identifying the portion of road as the "U.S. Navy S1c Guy Harlow Waugh Memorial Road"; and, be it

Further Resolved, That the Clerk of the House forward a copy of this resolution to the Commissioner of the Division of Highways.