Wyoming 2025 2025 Regular Session

Wyoming Senate Bill SF0169 Introduced / Bill

Filed 01/23/2025

                    2025
STATE OF WYOMING
25LSO-07131SF0169
SENATE FILE NO. SF0169
Strategic investments and projects account-repeal.
Sponsored by: Senator(s) Hicks, Driskill, Gierau, Laursen, 
D, Nethercott and Salazar and 
Representative(s) Allemand, Angelos, Bear, 
Heiner, Pendergraft and Smith, S
A BILL
for
1 AN ACT relating to public funds; repealing the strategic 
2 investments and projects account; providing for the 
3 transfer from and the reversion of funds from the strategic 
4 investments and projects account; making conforming 
5 amendments; repealing obsolete language; requiring reports; 
6 and providing for an effective date.
7
8
9
10.  W.S. 9-4-220.1 and 9-4-719(q)(i) are 
11 amended to read:
12
13
14 2025STATE OF WYOMING25LSO-07132SF0169
1
2 (a)  There is created the Wyoming state penitentiary 
3 capital construction account. 
4
5 Funds in the account shall only be expended upon 
6 legislative appropriation. Through the fiscal year ending 
7 June 30, 2034, all funds within the account shall be 
8 invested in the pool A investment account by the state 
9 treasurer pursuant to W.S. 9-4-715(p). Thereafter, all 
10 funds within the account shall be invested as determined by 
11 the state treasurer. All investment earnings from the 
12 account shall be credited to the account. For purposes of 
13
14
15
16
17
18 (b)  Beginning on June 30,  for fiscal year 
19 and June 30 of each fiscal year thereafter as 
20 provided in this subsection, the state treasurer shall 
21 transfer ten million dollars ($10,000,000.00), or as much 
22 thereof as is available, from any unobligated funds within 
23 the   2025STATE OF WYOMING25LSO-07133SF0169
1 to the Wyoming state penitentiary capital construction 
2 account. The state treasurer shall cease transferring funds 
3 to the Wyoming state penitentiary capital construction 
4 account pursuant to this subsection on July 1, 2038.
5
6
7
8
9 (q)  The earnings from the permanent Wyoming mineral 
10 trust fund under W.S. 9-4-204(u)(iii) during each fiscal 
11 year beginning July 1, 2016, which are less than the 
12 spending policy established in subsection (d) of this 
13 section are appropriated from the general fund subject to 
14 subsection (s) of this section and the following:
15
16 (i)  Any earnings in excess of two and one-half 
17 percent (2.5%) of the previous five (5) year average market 
18 value of the trust fund, calculated from the first day of 
19 the fiscal year and less than or equal to the spending 
20 policy amount specified in subsection (d) of this section 
21 shall be credited to the legislative stabilization reserve 
22 account; created by W.S. 9-4-219 and the strategic  2025STATE OF WYOMING25LSO-07134SF0169
1
2
3
4W.S. 9-4-220 and 9-4-719(b)(i) are 
5 repealed. 
6
7The strategic investments and projects 
8 account is repealed.
9
10On July 1, 2026, all funds in the 
11 strategic investments and projects account shall be 
12 transferred by the state auditor to the general fund. Any 
13 unexpended funds that have been appropriated or obligated 
14 from the strategic investments and projects account before 
15 July 1, 2026 shall be paid from the general fund. Any funds 
16 that are directed to revert by law to the strategic 
17 investments and projects account shall revert to the 
18 general fund. All accrued revenues that would otherwise be 
19 deposited in the strategic investments and projects account 
20 shall be deposited in the general fund.
21
22Not later than October 31, 2026 and again 
23 not later than October 31, 2027, the state auditor shall  2025STATE OF WYOMING25LSO-07135SF0169
1 report to the joint appropriations committee on the amounts 
2 transferred under section 4 of this act.
3
4This act is effective July 1, 2026.
5
6 (END)