All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR161
Introduced
6/26/24
Engrossed
6/30/24
Introduced
6/26/24
Engrossed
6/30/24
This resolution recognizes November 2024 as Gluten-Free Diet Awareness Month in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR162
Introduced
6/26/24
Engrossed
6/30/24
Introduced
6/26/24
Engrossed
6/30/24
This House Concurrent Resolution recognizes the second week of October 2024 as Obesity Care Week in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR163
Introduced
6/27/24
Engrossed
6/30/24
Introduced
6/27/24
Engrossed
6/30/24
This Concurrent Resolution honors the Marine Corps 249th Birthday on November 10, 2024.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR164
Introduced
6/27/24
Engrossed
6/30/24
Introduced
6/27/24
Engrossed
6/30/24
This Resolution recognizes June 2024 as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Month and June 27, 2024, as Post-Traumatic Stress Injury Day, and encourages citizens of the state to continue their work educating victims of assault or abuse, combat, serious accidents, and natural disasters about the causes, symptoms, and treatment of PTSI.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR17
Introduced
3/16/23
Introduced
3/16/23
Engrossed
3/16/23
This House Concurrent Resolution designates the 21st day of the Month of March, 2023 as Rock Your Socks for World Down Syndrome Day and celebrates the beauty and contributions that people with Down Syndrome make in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR18
Introduced
3/16/23
Introduced
3/16/23
Failed
3/16/23
This Concurrent Resolution designates March 23, 2023 as National Atheists' Day in Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR19
Introduced
3/16/23
Introduced
3/16/23
Engrossed
3/16/23
This resolution recognizes the Easterseals/CAI Volleyball Challenge occurring March 25 at William Penn High School and March 26 at Delaware State University, an event that raises funds for an organization providing services and support to Delawareans with disabilities and senior citizens and their families.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR2
Introduced
1/18/23
Engrossed
1/24/23
Introduced
1/18/23
Engrossed
1/24/23
This Concurrent Resolution commemorates January 22nd, 2023 as the 50th Anniversary of the United States Supreme Court ruling in Roe v. Wade.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR20
Introduced
3/16/23
Introduced
3/16/23
Engrossed
3/16/23
This Concurrent Resolution requests the Delaware State Fire School propose a plan for the safe disposal of aqueous film forming foam (AFFF), due to the per- and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) they contain from Delaware Fire Departments and companies. The Delaware State Fire School is to provide a report to the President Pro Tempore, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, the Office of the Controller General, and the Director of the Office of Management and Budget. The report is also to include the cost of disposal and the cost to obtain safe, viable, alternatives. The concept would be to fund this disposal foam and remove it from the Delaware Fire Service by a one-time exchange of this foam voluntarily and allowing the Fire Service the opportunity to replace AFFF with a new compliant supply at no cost to them.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR21
Introduced
3/28/23
Introduced
3/28/23
Engrossed
3/28/23
This concurrent resolution designates March 24, 2023 as Women and Girls in STEM Day in the State of Delaware.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR22
Introduced
3/28/23
Introduced
3/28/23
Engrossed
3/28/23
This Concurrent Resolution supports Congressional efforts to proclaim the 4th Thursday in March a National Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR23
Introduced
3/28/23
Introduced
3/28/23
Engrossed
3/28/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes 2023 as the 85th Anniversary of the founding of the Claymont Lions Club.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR24
Introduced
4/25/23
Introduced
4/25/23
Engrossed
4/25/23
This Concurrent Resolutions recognizes April 25, 2023, as Delaware Teach Children to Save Day.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR25
Introduced
3/16/23
Introduced
3/16/23
Engrossed
3/16/23
This concurrent resolution commemorates the 25th Anniversary of the Good Friday Agreement and celebrates St. Patrick's Day.
DE
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR26
Introduced
3/29/23
Introduced
3/29/23
Engrossed
3/29/23
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes March 2023, as PROBLEM GAMBLING AWARENESS MONTH in the State of Delaware and calls on all Delawareans to support the National Council on Problem Gambling and the Delaware Council on Gambling Problems, Inc. in their efforts to Have the conversation with friends, family, patients, and clients about gambling addiction.