LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Delaware DE
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR24
DE
Delaware House Bill HCR24
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session
Delaware House Bill HCR24
Introduced
4/25/23
Introduced
4/25/23
Engrossed
4/25/23
Caption
Recognizing April 25, 2023, As "delaware Teach Children To Save Day".
Latest HCR24 Activity
Companion Bills
No companion bills found.
Previously Filed As
DE HCR23
In Celebration Of The 85th Anniversary Of The Claymont Lions Club.
DE HCR18
Designating March 23, 2023 As National Atheists Day In Delaware.
DE HCR42
Recognizing The Month Of May 2023 As Mental Health Awareness Month.
DE HCR28
Designating March 30, 2023, As Atheist Awareness Day In Delaware.
DE HCR7
Recognizing January 27th, 2023 As International Holocaust Remembrance Day.
DE HCR5
Designating January 22-28, 2023 As Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists' Week In The State Of Delaware.
DE HCR3
Designating January 23, 2023, As "maternal Health Awareness Day" In The State Of Delaware.
DE HCR30
Recognizing The Holy Month Of Ramadan And Muslim Residents Of This State As They Observe Ramadan.
Similar Bills
TX HB2492
Relating to the family allowance, treatment of exempt property, and an allowance in lieu of exempt property in the administration of a decedent's estate.
CA AB1221
Children’s advocacy centers.
CA SB18
Bill of Rights for the Children and Youth of California: joint legislative committee.
CA SB1447
Hospitals: seismic compliance: Children’s Hospital Los Angeles.
CA AB1737
Children’s camps: safety.
CA AB555
California state preschool programs: reimbursement amounts: adjustment factors.
CA AR68
Relative to Children’s Environmental Health Month 2021.
CA AR123
Relative to Children’s Environmental Health Month.