All Bills - Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR8

Introduced
1/24/23  
Introduced
1/24/23  
This resolution recognizes January 2023 as "National Mentoring Month" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR80

Introduced
6/15/23  
Introduced
6/15/23  
This Concurrent Resolution recognizes June 15, 2023, as "Delaware Elder Abuse Awareness Day" and encourages all of Delaware's citizens to learn about how to protect and nurture our elderly citizens.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR81

Introduced
6/27/23  
Introduced
6/27/23  
This resolution recognizes August 26, 2023, as "Women's Equality Day" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR82

Introduced
6/29/23  
Introduced
6/29/23  
This resolution recognizes October 18, 2023, as "Financial Aid Day" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR83

Introduced
6/20/23  
Introduced
6/20/23  
This resolution recognizes August 17, 2023, as "National Nonprofit Day" in Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR84

Introduced
6/20/23  
Introduced
6/20/23  
This resolution designates Saturday, September 30, 2023, as "GFWC Delaware Step Up to End Hunger Day of Service" in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR85

Introduced
6/20/23  
Introduced
6/20/23  
This resolution celebrates the 75th anniversary of Camp Barnes and its dedication to the youth of the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR86

Introduced
6/27/23  
Introduced
6/27/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution requests that the Delaware Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control update the analysis and recommendations presented in the Senate Joint Resolution No. 2 Report utilizing the new information provided by the most recently promulgated federal wetlands regulations and the results of the Supreme Court case, Sackett vs. EPA, by September 30, 2023.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR87

Introduced
6/22/23  
Introduced
6/22/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution proclaims the month of October 2023 as Depression Awareness Month in the State of Delaware.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR88

Introduced
6/21/23  
Introduced
6/21/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution extends heartfelt congratulations and best wishes to members of the Delaware State Bar Association on the occasion of the 100th Anniversary of the establishment of the modern bar association in 1923.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR89

Introduced
6/21/23  
Introduced
6/21/23  
This resolution requests the Office of Management and Budget to conduct an assessment of using State surplus real property for the development of affordable housing.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR9

Introduced
1/25/23  
Introduced
1/25/23  
This resolution recognizes March 2, 2023, as "Delaware Giving Day."
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR90

Introduced
6/22/23  
Introduced
6/22/23  
This Concurrent Resolution encourages institutions, agencies, entities, and businesses that operate within Delaware, to purchase Delaware-grown food and value-added items. The Resolution also directs the Delaware Council on Farm and Food Policy to work with state agencies, higher education institutions, and other partners to prepare a report outlining current local procurement efforts to support a locally sourced food economy in Delaware, and to submit the report to the Governor and the members of the General Assembly by June 30, 2024. In addition, any updates on efforts must be submitted by December 31, 2024.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR91

Introduced
6/21/23  
Introduced
6/21/23  
This resolution recognizes October 8, 2023 as "National Latina Women's Equal Pay Day" in the State of Delaware and encourages all Delawareans to join in recognizing the contributions Latina women have made in every aspect of life, and the sacrifices they have made to champion equality.
DE

Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR92

Introduced
6/29/23  
Introduced
6/29/23  
This Senate Concurrent Resolution reaffirms Delawares commitment to strengthen the longstanding partnership with Taiwan, supports Taiwans efforts to secure the signing of a Bilateral Trade Agreement and an Avoidance of Double Taxation Agreement with the United States; commends Taiwans vibrant full-fledged democracy; and continues to support Taiwans meaningful participation and contributions in international organizations.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records