All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HR99

Introduced
3/7/25  
Refer
3/14/25  
Report Pass
3/27/25  
Urging The Counties To Adopt Local Zoning Ordinances To Require Owners Of Agricultural-zoned Lands To Execute And Record Declarations That Acknowledge State And County Agricultural Land Use Regulations And Requirements And Penalties For Noncompliance.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1

Introduced
1/15/25  
Prohibits certain foreign parties from owning, purchasing, or acquiring an interest in agricultural lands. Establishes an Office of Agricultural Intelligence within the Department of Agriculture to investigate claims that land is unlawfully owned by a prohibited foreign party. Requires the Attorney General to undertake enforcement activities. Appropriates moneys.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB10

Introduced
1/15/25  
Prohibits the sale and use of disposable air filters beginning January 1, 2030. Requires the State to establish reusable air filters as the new standard.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB100

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/16/25  
Report Pass
2/11/25  
Refer
2/11/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/27/25  
Enrolled
3/28/25  
Chaptered
4/11/25  
Provides that leaders of nonprofit organizations shall not be fingerprinted when applying for a liquor license in counties with a population of less than five hundred thousand. (SD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1000

Introduced
1/17/25  
Appropriates funds to the Department of Education for teacherrequested classroom supplies.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1001

Introduced
1/17/25  
Requires the Department of Education to implement dyslexiasensitive universal screenings and evidence-based interventions, offer professional development on structured literacy and evidenced-based interventions, and support pre-teacher programs in training candidates in structured literary instruction.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1002

Introduced
1/17/25  
Refer
1/23/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/14/25  
Refer
3/14/25  
Report Pass
3/20/25  
Refer
3/20/25  
Beginning 7/1/2027, requires the State Historic Preservation Division of the Department of Land and Natural Resources to contract its review of proposed state projects and projects affecting historic properties to third-party consultants under certain circumstances. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to publish a draft of its proposed rules and later present its proposed final rules to the Board of Land and Natural Resources. Appropriates funds. Sunsets 7/1/2032. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1003

Introduced
1/17/25  
Refer
1/23/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds to the Agribusiness Development Corporation for the purchase of a land parcel in Kau for agricultural development. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1004

Introduced
1/17/25  
Requires the Department of Health to establish and administer a three-year Rural Community Health Worker Pilot Program that enables community health workers to provide outreach, education, training, and navigation to individuals residing in rural communities in the State and address social determinants of health. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1005

Introduced
1/17/25  
Refer
1/23/25  
Clarifies the Lieutenant Governor's duties as Secretary of State for Intergovernmental Relations, including working to prevent other jurisdictions from making or supporting travel arrangements to Hawaii for homeless or unhoused individuals.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1006

Introduced
1/17/25  
Prohibits certain foreign parties from owning, purchasing, or acquiring an interest in lands located with 10 miles of a military installation or land within the State. Establishes an Office of Intelligence within the Department of Defense to investigate claims that land is unlawfully owned by a prohibited foreign party. Requires the Attorney General to undertake enforcement activities. Appropriates moneys.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1007

Introduced
1/17/25  
Requires the Statewide Office on Homelessness and Housing Solutions to establish the Interstate Collaboration on Homelessness to discourage sending unsupported homeless individuals to other states and territories. Requires the Statewide Office on Homelessness and Housing Solutions to enter into formal agreements with other states to reimburse costs associated with relocated homeless individuals. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1008

Introduced
1/17/25  
Refer
1/23/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/18/25  
Refer
3/18/25  
Report Pass
3/27/25  
Report Pass
4/24/25  
Authorizes the counties to adopt ordinances to enforce the accessible parking space requirements for parking spaces reserved for persons with disabilities and electric vehicles. (CD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1009

Introduced
1/17/25  
Refer
1/23/25  
Refer
2/4/25  
Report Pass
2/10/25  
Refer
2/10/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/13/25  
Refer
3/13/25  
Report Pass
3/21/25  
Refer
3/21/25  
Establishes a state reserved parking space enforcement fine for the unauthorized use of parking spaces reserved for persons with disabilities or electric vehicles. Deposits fifty percent of all fines into the general fund and fifty percent of all fines into the Safe Routes to School Program Special Fund. Specifies that a fine shall not be imposed on a person who parks in a space designated and marked as reserved for electric vehicles if the electric vehicle charging system is visibly inoperable or broken. (CD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB101

Introduced
1/15/25  
Refer
1/16/25  
Report Pass
2/11/25  
Requires graduates of the University of Hawaii John A. Burns School of Medicine who have paid in-state tuition to serve as a physician in the State for at least 2 years following their medical residency or fellowship. Begins with the class of 2029. Effective 7/31/2050. (SD1)

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records