All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1079
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Temporarily allows each county, by resolution of its county council, to petition for the redistricting of land from an agricultural district to a rural district through the Land Use Commission's declaratory ruling process. Effective 7/1/2026. Sunsets 6/30/2029.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB108
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Requires the Department of Transportation to work with relevant stakeholders to conduct a study of noise regulations and best practices as they apply to other ports in similar locations. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1080
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires owners, lessees, or managers of real property to maintain their property and establish penalties for failure to do so. Allows for exceptions.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1081
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Requires the Department of Budget and Finance to conduct a feasibility study on the associated costs of establishing and implementing a Legislative Budget Office. Requires a report to the Legislature. Repeals the Joint Legislative Budget Committee and the Office of the Legislative Analyst. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2491. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1082
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes the pae ula as the state shrimp to protect anchialine pool ecosystems throughout Hawaii.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1083
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Report Pass
2/27/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/20/25
Refer
3/20/25
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to include line-item funding for maintenance dredging at state small boat harbor facilities in its annual budget request. Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to conduct maintenance dredging at state small boat harbors, boat launch ramp facilities, and waterways. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1084
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Appropriates funds to establish positions within the Division of Aquatic Resources of the Department of Land and Natural Resources. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1085
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Establishes a pilot program within the Department of Agriculture to determine feasibility and prepare an environmental impact statement to drill non-potable water wells on individual parcels at Panaewa agricultural park and Panaewa farm lots. Requires DOA to consult and coordinate with the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands on the location and distribution of water from the wells before and after the completion of the EIS. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1086
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Authorizes the Director of Finance to issue general obligation bonds and appropriates funds to finance capital improvement projects for irrigation systems. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1087
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes the Hawaii Airports Corporation (HAC)to assume the authority, functions, and duties of the Department of Transportation related to airports and aeronautics. Makes HAC subject to chapters 103D and 104, HRS. Provides for project labor agreements. Appropriates funds for the transfer of functions from DOT to HAC.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1088
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Provides rebates for the installation of eligible electric vehicle-ready parking stalls for new construction of affordable housing.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1089
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires the design of all new state building construction where parking is to be included to provide that at least twenty-five per cent of parking stalls be electric vehicle charger-ready. Requires the Hawaii State Energy Office, in consultation with the Department of Accounting and General Services and Department of Transportation, to conduct a survey and identify certain high-priority state facilities. Establishes a goal of the State to retrofit state facilities to be electric vehicle charger-ready. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB109
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Refer
3/7/25
Report Pass
4/2/25
Requires that the Hawaiian version of a law be held binding if the law in question was originally drafted in Hawaiian and meets certain criteria. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1090
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires solar conduit- and electrical panel-readiness for new residential construction offered for sale at fair market value and electric vehicle-readiness when an electrical panel and parking area are installed. Effective 1/1/2026.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1091
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/13/25
Refer
2/13/25
Requires the Comptroller, in coordination with the Department of Human Resources Development, to periodically assess telework-eligible allocations of employees of certain state executive branch departments and agencies. Requires the first assessment and notification to be completed by 6/30/2026. Establishes a position within the Department of Accounting and General Services. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2491. (SD1)