All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1213
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Allows businesses in the State to designate an email address to accept service of process in lieu of continuously maintaining a registered agent in the State.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1214
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Establishes a Vacant Homes Special Fund under the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation for rental assistance programs. Establishes a general excise tax surcharge on an owner that allows a residential real property to remain vacant for 180 days or more a year. Requires persons who own residential real property, but do not live there, to obtain a general excise tax license. Requires the counties to disclose to the Department of Taxation a list of properties classified as not being occupied by an owner of that property. Requires the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to calculate average annual rental value for the basis for the surcharge amount.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1215
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Establishes the Malama Aina Visitor Impact Tax Program within the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to allocate funds to state agencies to improve the quality of visitor experience to sustain the economic benefits contributed by the visitor industry and protect, restore, and manage the State's natural and cultural resources. Establishes the Malama Aina Visitor Impact Tax Special Fund to fund the program. Increases the transient accommodations tax by one per cent from 1/1/2026 to 12/31/2030 and requires the additional tax revenues to be deposited into the Special Fund. Requires the Department to submit annual reports to the Legislature. Repeals 12/31/2030.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1216
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Refer
1/28/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/2/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Report Pass
4/24/25
Conditions the issuance of a certificate of inspection upon a vehicle or moped not being equipped with a noisy muffler or exhaust system. Requires rules regarding safety check inspections to ensure that a vehicle or moped is not equipped with a noisy muffler or exhaust system. Suspends, revokes, or refuses renewal of a permit for an official inspection station for repeatedly violating any rule regarding inspecting a noisy muffler or exhaust system within a certain period. Clarifies the types of mufflers that are prohibited. Increases the maximum fine for motor vehicle owners that violate noisy muffler laws. Includes repairing or installing a noisy muffler or exhaust system as a prohibited practice for motor vehicle repair laws. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1217
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Appropriates funds to the University of Hawaii John A. Burns School of Medicine for faculty positions in the fields of cardiovascular biology, tropical medicine, and quantitative health biostatistics, and an environmental health and safety officer staff position. Effective 7/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1218
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Establishes the Homeless Services Special Fund. Allows counties to apply for matching funds from the Affordable Homeownership Revolving Fund for certain housing projects. Increases the conveyance tax rates for certain properties. Repeals the separate conveyance tax rates for the sale of a condominium or single family residence for which the purchaser is ineligible for a county homeowner's exemption on property tax and establishes conveyance tax rates for multifamily residential properties. Establishes new exemptions to the conveyance tax. Allocates collected conveyance taxes to the Affordable Homeownership Revolving Fund, Homeless Services Special Fund and general fund. Amends allocations to the Land Conservation Fund and Rental Housing Revolving Fund.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1219
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Transfers the jurisdiction of the Motor Carrier Law from the Public Utilities Commission to the Department of Transportation. Transfers the jurisdiction of the Water Carrier Act from the Public Utilities Commission to the Department of Transportation. Makes conforming amendments. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2027.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB122
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/17/25
Expands the prohibition of class 11 cabaret licenses to premises within apartment mixed use subprecincts of special districts and special improvement districts.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1220
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Requires gas utility companies to submit proposed renewable gas tariffs to the Public Utilities Commission by 8/31/2025. Requires the Public Utilities Commission to establish a renewable gas tariff within nine months of receiving a completed application for a proposed renewable gas tariff. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1221
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/14/25
Refer
3/14/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Report Pass
4/25/25
Beginning 1/1/2027, requires the counties to adopt ordinances for the regulation of retention and detention ponds. Requires the counties to conduct a survey of existing retention and detention ponds and submit a report to the Legislature. (CD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1222
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Prohibits counties from permitting or allowing retention or detention ponds to be constructed except under certain conditions. Establishes safety requirements for retention and detention ponds statewide. Requires the department of health to conduct a survey of existing retention and detention ponds statewide.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1223
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Requires, and appropriates funds for, the Department of Education to establish a standards-based Water Safety Education Pilot Program.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1224
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Prohibits health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations from arbitrarily denying coverage requests for gender affirming health care services when the requested service is known to be considered a standard of care and for which scientific evidence exists that supports the service. Increases transparency of insurance carrier medical necessity reviews and requirements when coverage is denied.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1225
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/4/25
Refer
2/4/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Enrolled
3/10/25
Report Pass
3/21/25
Refer
3/21/25
Proposes to amend article XVII, section 3 of the Hawaii State Constitution regarding the standard for ratification of a constitutional amendment proposed by the Legislature, to require that a majority of all the votes tallied upon the question be a "yes" vote, and not include blank, spoiled, and over votes in determining whether a majority was reached. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB1226
Introduced
1/23/25
Refer
1/27/25
Report Pass
2/11/25
Refer
2/11/25
Establishes the Shipping Container Inspection Program. Requires the Department of Law Enforcement to submit reports to the Legislature on implementation of the Shipping Container Inspection Program. Exempts employees of the Department of Transportation and DLE from personal liability under certain conditions. Requires any damages to container goods be borne by the State. Requires DLE and DOT to designate a site outside of the immediate port area to conduct inspections. Require the DLE to secure all illegal goods. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)