All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1590

Introduced
1/23/25  
Establishes the Insurance Affordability Assistance Pilot Program within the Insurance Division of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs to assist eligible homeowners with sudden increases in property insurance premiums. Sunsets 6/30/2028.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1591

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Appropriates funds to the Department of Health and Department of Agriculture to prevent, monitor, and respond to avian influenza in Hawaii. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1592

Introduced
1/23/25  
Appropriates funds for the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to allocate to housing counseling agencies certified by the United States Department of Housing and Urban Development to provide housing counseling services. Requires a report to the Legislature regarding services provided by the housing counseling agencies.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1593

Introduced
1/23/25  
Repeals the authority for campaign funds to carry over to subsequent elections. Requires, at the latest, for campaign funds not expended to escheat to the State after a certain period. Requires the Campaign Spending Commission to make reasonable efforts to return escheated funds to contributors with any remaining balance to fund partially publicly financed campaigns.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1594

Introduced
1/23/25  
Proposes a constitutional amendment to limit the number of years members may serve in the Legislature to a maximum of sixteen years.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1595

Introduced
1/23/25  
Repeals registration requirements relating to qualifying outofstate medical cannabis patients who are validly registered in other states, United States territories, or the District of Columbia. Repeals language requiring an initial inperson consultation before physicians and advanced practice registered nurses may make medical cannabis treatment recommendations via telehealth. Prohibits the Department of Health from imposing fees for patients' medical cannabis registration certificates.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1596

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Requires the State Board of Nursing to identify one facility in each of the counties of Hawaii, Kauai, and Maui that has the capability to establish a Pearson VUE Authorized Test Center as a test site to administer a National Council Licensure Examination for nurses; equip each facility identified with the technical and facility requirements necessary for a Pearson VUE Authorized Test Center; and submit an application for each facility to Pearson Education, Inc. to be authorized and contracted as a Pearson VUE Authorized Test Center. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1597

Introduced
1/23/25  
Increases the valuation threshold of development subject to a special management area minor permit or a special management area use permit from $500,000 to $750,000.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1598

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires the Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation and Adaptation Commission to develop adaptation pathways plans to modify and relocate development and associated infrastructure away from critically vulnerable areas to locations outside of sea level rise and coastal flooding exposure area. Appropriates funds.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1599

Introduced
1/23/25  
Requires the Director of Human Resources Development to abolish vacant positions within state departments and agencies under its jurisdiction that have been vacant for more than five years. Requires a list of positions abolished to be included in the Director's annual report to the Legislature. Requires funds for abolished positions to immediately lapse to the credit of the general fund.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB16

Introduced
1/15/25  
Exempts persons engaging in aquaculture research from the aquarium fish permit requirement. Defines aquaculture research.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB160

Introduced
1/15/25  
Requires the Department of Health to construct a mental health facility for inmates or detainees with mental health needs in the custody of the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Appropriates moneys.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1600

Introduced
1/23/25  
Appropriates funds to the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to hire necessary staff, purchase equipment, and retain professional services on behalf of the Public Land Trust Working Group.
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1601

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/14/25  
Refer
2/14/25  
Report Pass
2/28/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Establishes within the Hawaii Green Infrastructure Authority the Condominium Loan Program to provide qualified condominium associations with low-cost financing or refinancing on previously obtained loans for maintenance or repair projects. Limits loan terms to 20 years and prohibits any new loans after 6/30/2047. Establishes the Condominium Loan Loss Reserves Program to incentivize community development financial institutions into providing loans at competitive rates and terms to condominium associations for the purpose of allowing condominium associations to make necessary maintenance or repairs. Requires annual reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds into and out of the Condominium Loan Revolving Fund. Effective 7/1/2050. Repeals 06/30/2047. (SD2)
HI

Hawaii 2025 Regular Session

Hawaii Senate Bill SB1602

Introduced
1/23/25  
Refer
1/27/25  
Report Pass
2/12/25  
Refer
2/12/25  
Report Pass
2/27/25  
Engrossed
3/4/25  
Refer
3/6/25  
Report Pass
3/20/25  
Refer
3/20/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Report Pass
4/24/25  
Report Pass
4/24/25  
Establishes the Keauhou Aquifer System Monitoring Pilot Project. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to determine whether to continue, expand, or end the Pilot Project. Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources for the Pilot Project. Requires reports to the Legislature. (CD1)

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records