All Bills - Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB705
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Prohibits excited delirium from being recognized as a valid medical diagnosis or cause of death in the State. Prohibits a local health officer or local agent of the Department of Health from stating on a certificate of death or in any report that the cause of death was excited delirium. Prohibits law enforcement officers from using the term excited delirium to describe an individual in an incident report. Establishes a new rule of evidence that deems evidence that a person experienced or suffered an excited delirium inadmissible in a civil action.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB706
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/10/25
Refer
2/10/25
Requires the Hawaii Property Insurance Association to include in its plan of operation insurance coverage for commercial properties twice denied by private insurers. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB707
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Establishes a Lava Zone Insurance Fund to subsidize the cost of insurance premiums for properties in lava zones 1 and 2. Defines lava zones 1 and 2. Appropriates funds.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB708
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Authorizes and appropriates moneys for the Board of Psychology to grant prescriptive authority to clinical psychologists who meet specific education, training, and registration requirements. Requires the Board of Psychology to accept applications for prescriptive authority privilege beginning 7/1/2026. Requires the Board of Psychology to report to the Legislature.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB709
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Requires the Department of Health (DOH) to track and publicly report certain data relating to crisis reports, emergency mental health transports, and court-ordered treatments. Requires the DOH to respond to reports about persons having severe mental illness who are in need of assistance, assess whether those persons fulfill criteria for assisted community treatment, and coordinate the process for an assisted community treatment order if indicated. Establishes that a court's denial of a petition for involuntary commitment shall serve as notification to the DOH that the subject of the petition should be evaluated for assisted community treatment. Appropriates funds. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB71
Introduced
1/15/25
Refer
1/16/25
Report Pass
2/5/25
Refer
2/5/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Establishes the Mixed-Income Subaccount within the Rental Housing Revolving Fund that targets workforce rental housing projects for persons and families with incomes at or below one hundred forty per cent of the area median income. Authorizes the Director of Finance to transfer funds from the Rental Housing Revolving Fund into the Mixed-Income Subaccount. Appropriates funds into and out of the Mixed-Income Subaccount of the Rental Housing Revolving Fund. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB710
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/14/25
Refer
2/14/25
Establishes the Child Welfare Task Force to develop strategies and policy changes to transform and improve the State's child welfare system. Requires support from the Department of Human Services. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB711
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/12/25
Refer
2/12/25
Requires any appointment of a person by the Governor to serve in the Executive Branch in the position of an advisor to be subject to the advice and consent of the Senate if that person's salary is greater than $200,000, and is not paid from the Governor's budget. Requires the Governor to transmit Governor's Messages to the Senate President containing nominations for each gubernatorial appointee who was appointed to their advisor position before the effective date of this Act and whose salary is greater than $200,000, and is not paid from the Governor's budget. Effective 1/1/2491. (SD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB712
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Expands the preschool open door program's eligibility criteria. Repeals the requirement that open door program providers be accredited.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB713
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to provide health insurance through Medicaid's Children's Health Insurance Program to income-qualified children and pregnant persons regardless of their immigration status.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB714
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to provide Medicaid coverage under the Children's Health Insurance Program for income-qualified pregnant persons and children who are otherwise ineligible due to their immigration status.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB715
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Appropriates funds to the Department of Human Services to achieve full funding status, including estimated payment increases, of Medicaid home- and community-based services.
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB716
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Refer
2/6/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/18/25
Refer
3/18/25
Expands the circumstances where the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations may waive the requirements for individuals to register to work and report to an employment office to be eligible for unemployment benefits. Authorize the Department to allow individuals to report to a location other than an employment office or other location approved pursuant to its rules. Beginning 4/1/2027, requires notices of determinations and documentation relating to appeals to be sent electronically, unless the election for mail is made. Allows an individual to change an elected withholding status more than once during a benefit year. Amends the statutory definition of "registered for work" or "registration for work". Repeals the requirement for individuals to post their work availability online to be eligible for unemployment benefits. Repeals the statutory provision for joint experience rating. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB717
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Refer
1/29/25
Report Pass
2/6/25
Refer
2/6/25
Report Pass
2/28/25
Engrossed
3/4/25
Refer
3/6/25
Report Pass
3/13/25
Refer
3/13/25
Report Pass
4/4/25
Repeals the prohibition placed on certain employees exempt from Civil Service Law from grieving a suspension or discharge. Allows any employee who is a member of an appropriate bargaining unit to grieve a suspension or discharge. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
HI
Hawaii 2025 Regular Session
Hawaii Senate Bill SB718
Introduced
1/17/25
Refer
1/23/25
Requires all places of public accommodation and public entity constructions constructed after 7/31/2026, to provide universal changing accommodations that are equally accessible regardless of gender.