All Bills - Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR62
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/8/14
Recognizes Monday, April 7, 2014, as LSU Day at the state capitol
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR63
Introduced
4/7/14
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/8/14
Passed
4/8/14
Recognizes Tuesday, April 8, 2014, as March of Dimes Day at the state capitol
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR64
Introduced
4/7/14
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/8/14
Passed
4/8/14
Commends the members and coaches of the Lutcher High School girls' powerlifting team, past and present, upon winning eight consecutive state championships
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR65
Introduced
4/7/14
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/8/14
Passed
4/8/14
Commends the Lutcher High School girls' powerlifting team upon winning the 2014 Division II Class 4A state championship
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR66
Introduced
4/7/14
Introduced
4/7/14
Refer
4/8/14
Refer
4/8/14
Report Pass
4/15/14
Report Pass
4/15/14
Passed
4/28/14
Passed
4/28/14
Urges and requests the Department of Transportation and Development to conduct a traffic study at the United States 171-Moeling Street intersection in Calcasieu Parish
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR67
Introduced
4/7/14
Passed
4/8/14
Commends the efforts of The Links, Incorporated and recognizes Wednesday, April 23, 2014, as Louisiana Links Day at the state capitol
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR68
Introduced
4/8/14
Passed
4/9/14
Commends Gerald "Gerry" James McGee, renowned Cajun musician
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR69
Introduced
4/8/14
Introduced
4/8/14
Passed
4/9/14
Passed
4/9/14
Recognizes Thursday, April 10, 2014, as University of Louisiana System Day at the state capitol and commends the system for its nationally recognized education, research, and public service
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR7
Introduced
3/10/14
Introduced
3/10/14
Passed
3/11/14
Passed
3/11/14
Commends Terrance Simien upon winning his second Grammy Award
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR70
Introduced
4/8/14
Introduced
4/8/14
Passed
4/9/14
Passed
4/9/14
Recognizes Thursday, April 10th as Baton Rouge Parliamentarians Day
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR71
Introduced
4/9/14
Introduced
4/9/14
Refer
4/10/14
Refer
4/10/14
Report Pass
4/14/14
Report Pass
4/14/14
Passed
4/28/14
Passed
4/28/14
Requests DOTD to study the adoption of special signage to designate streets and highways in honor of military personnel
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR72
Introduced
4/10/14
Introduced
4/10/14
Passed
4/22/14
Passed
4/22/14
Commends the Shreveport-Bossier Mavericks professional basketball team
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR73
Introduced
4/10/14
Passed
4/15/14
Passed
4/15/14
Expresses the condolences of the House of Representatives upon the death of noted civil rights leader, educator, and pastor, Rev. Charles E. Bryant, Ph.D., of Opelousas
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR74
Introduced
4/10/14
Introduced
4/10/14
Passed
4/22/14
Passed
4/22/14
Commends Pastor Beryl I. Cowthran upon her installation as General Overseer of the Full Gospel Baptist Church
LA
Louisiana 2014 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR75
Introduced
4/14/14
Introduced
4/14/14
Passed
4/15/14
Passed
4/15/14
Recognizes Monday, April 14, 2014, as NFIB/Louisiana Small Business Day at the state capitol