All Bills - Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR110
Introduced
5/12/15
Introduced
5/12/15
Refer
5/13/15
Report Pass
5/27/15
Report Pass
5/27/15
Passed
5/28/15
Passed
5/28/15
Requests the governor to appoint a cosmetologist or owner of a beauty shop or salon from the Vietnamese-American Community in Louisiana to serve on the Louisiana Board of Cosmetology at the occurrence of the next vacancy.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR111
Introduced
5/12/15
Introduced
5/12/15
Passed
5/13/15
Passed
5/13/15
Designates June 3, 2015, as 4-H Day at the legislature and commends the state 4-H officers.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR112
Introduced
5/12/15
Passed
5/13/15
Passed
5/13/15
Commends The Life of a Single Mom Ministries on its many accomplishments.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR113
Introduced
5/13/15
Introduced
5/13/15
Passed
5/13/15
Passed
5/13/15
Designates Wednesday, May 13, 2015, as Louisiana Housing Alliance Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR114
Introduced
5/13/15
Introduced
5/13/15
Passed
5/14/15
Passed
5/14/15
Commends Bruce E. Cutrer, Fire Chief for Tangipahoa Parish Fire District No. 1, for his many accomplishments as a firefighter.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR115
Introduced
5/13/15
Introduced
5/13/15
Passed
5/14/15
Passed
5/14/15
Congratulates Amanda Scott Trapp on her earning a Master of Public Administration from the LSU E. J. Ourso College of Business.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR116
Introduced
5/13/15
Passed
5/14/15
Recognizes the month of September 2015 as Pain Awareness Month in Louisiana.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR117
Introduced
5/14/15
Passed
5/14/15
Passed
5/14/15
Expresses condolences upon the death of Wayne William Foley.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR118
Introduced
5/14/15
Introduced
5/14/15
Passed
5/18/15
Commends the Louis A. Martinet Legal Society for its contributions to the legal profession and community and recognize May 21, 2015, as Louis A. Martinet Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR119
Introduced
5/14/15
Introduced
5/14/15
Passed
5/18/15
Passed
5/18/15
Recognizes Tuesday, May 19, 2015, as the 31st Annual Red and White Day at the Louisiana Legislature.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR12
Introduced
4/13/15
Refer
4/14/15
Refer
4/14/15
Report Pass
4/21/15
Report Pass
4/21/15
Passed
4/22/15
Extends the Pretrial Service Commission deadline until March 1, 2017.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR120
Introduced
5/18/15
Introduced
5/18/15
Refer
5/19/15
Refer
5/19/15
Report Pass
6/1/15
Passed
6/2/15
Passed
6/2/15
Requests the Senate Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs to study and make recommendations on how to establish recurring funding for the Louisiana Housing Trust Fund.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR121
Introduced
5/18/15
Introduced
5/18/15
Passed
5/19/15
Passed
5/19/15
Commends Ethan Coker for being named Louisiana's Middle/Junior High School Student of the Year.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR122
Introduced
5/18/15
Passed
5/19/15
Passed
5/19/15
Commends William Sommers as the recipient of the prestigious Don E. Wydra Memorial Award for his extraordinary contributions to juvenile justice and delinquency prevention.
LA
Louisiana 2015 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR123
Introduced
5/18/15
Introduced
5/18/15
Refer
5/19/15
Refer
5/19/15
Passed
5/19/15
Requests DOTD to convert inside shoulder of I-12 between the I-10/I-12 split and Walker to a travel lane.