All Bills - Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR106

Introduced
5/4/15  
Introduced
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Passed
5/6/15  
Commends Bo Myers for his heroic actions in saving his nephew's life using the CPR procedure he learned at Zachary High School
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR107

Introduced
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Designates June 3, 2015, as 4-H Day at the legislature and commends the state officers of 4-H
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR108

Introduced
5/4/15  
Introduced
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Passed
5/6/15  
Recognizes Tuesday, May 5, 2015, as Louisiana Association of Health Plans Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR109

Introduced
5/4/15  
Introduced
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Expresses condolences upon the death of Alphonse Jackson, Jr., former state representative and a founding member of the La. Legislative Black Caucus
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR11

Introduced
4/3/15  
Introduced
4/3/15  
Refer
4/3/15  
Refer
4/3/15  
Suspends all state sales and use tax exemptions
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR110

Introduced
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Engrossed
5/4/15  
Passed
5/6/15  
Designates May 5, 2015, as Alvin Dark Day at the state capitol and posthumously commends Alvin Dark for his extraordinary life and accomplishments
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR111

Introduced
5/5/15  
Introduced
5/5/15  
Engrossed
5/5/15  
Commends the Special Olympics Louisiana athletes from the Acadiana area who participated in the 2014 USA Games
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR112

Introduced
5/5/15  
Reduces the expenditure limit for FY 2015-2016 (OR SEE FISC NOTE EX See Note)
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR113

Introduced
5/5/15  
Introduced
5/5/15  
Refer
5/6/15  
Refer
5/6/15  
Report Pass
6/1/15  
Report Pass
6/1/15  
Engrossed
6/3/15  
Engrossed
6/3/15  
Passed
6/8/15  
Urges and requests the Office of Group Benefits to study the cost for each member school board to terminate participation in the programs offered by the Office of Group Benefits
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR114

Introduced
5/5/15  
Introduced
5/5/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Commends Eula Woodard upon her 100th birthday
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR115

Introduced
5/5/15  
Introduced
5/5/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Designates May 4 through May 8, 2015, as Teacher Appreciation Week at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR116

Introduced
5/6/15  
Introduced
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Recognizes Wednesday, May 6, 2015, as nurse practitioners day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR117

Introduced
5/6/15  
Introduced
5/6/15  
Refer
5/7/15  
Refer
5/7/15  
Report Pass
5/13/15  
Report Pass
5/13/15  
Engrossed
5/26/15  
Engrossed
5/26/15  
Refer
5/27/15  
Report Pass
6/2/15  
Authorizes and directs the La. State Law Institute to study the issue of restitution in delinquency cases and to report its findings to the La. Legislature
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR118

Introduced
5/6/15  
Introduced
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/6/15  
Passed
5/11/15  
Designates Wednesday, May 13, 2015, as School Board Member and School Superintendent Recognition Day at the state capitol
LA

Louisiana 2015 Regular Session

Louisiana House Bill HCR119

Introduced
5/6/15  
Engrossed
5/7/15  
Engrossed
5/7/15  
Commends citizens who serve as jurors and designates May 11 through May 15, 2015, as Jury Appreciation Week in the state of Louisiana

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records