All Bills - Oregon 2025 Regular Session

OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3327

Introduced
1/21/25  
The Act tells LPRO to do a study on laws affecting local governments. The Act tells LPRO to report on its study. (Flesch Readability Score: 80.3). Requires the Legislative Policy and Research Director to study legislation affecting local governments. Directs the director to submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to rules not later than September 15, 2026. Sunsets on January 2, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3328

Introduced
1/21/25  
Refer
1/24/25  
Refer
2/27/25  
Refer
2/27/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Engrossed
4/10/25  
Refer
4/10/25  
The Act would let Grant County use road fund moneys from federal forest reserves payments to patrol roads in the county. (Flesch Readability Score: 64.6). Adds Grant County to the list of counties that may use road fund moneys from federal forest reserves payments for patrolling on the county's roads. [Declares an emergency, effective on passage.].
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3329

Introduced
1/21/25  
Refer
1/24/25  
Refer
3/11/25  
The Act raises the total amount of tax credits allowed for people who give money to help people make a film or other media. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.0). Increases the amount of total tax credits allowed for certified film production development contributions made to the Oregon Production Investment Fund. Applies to fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2025. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3330

Introduced
1/21/25  
The Act expands laws that protect a health care worker's right to object to taking part in certain health care treatments. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.7). Provides protections for a person who refuses to participate in a procedure related to abortion, physician-assisted suicide or gender-affirming treatment if the refusal is based on a person's ethical, moral or religious convictions. Allows a health care facility to refuse to perform a procedure related to abortion, physician-assisted suicide or gender-affirming treatment. Allows a person to bring an action for damages and equitable relief against a health care facility, health professional regulatory agency, employer or school for a violation. Directs a court to award attorney fees to a prevailing plaintiff.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3331

Introduced
1/21/25  
The Act says that a portion of dividends paid by SAIF must be redirected into a fund for disaster preparedness. The Act creates a board to advise on how the fund is used. (Flesch Readability Score: 72.1). Provides that a percentage of dividends paid by the State Accident Insurance Fund Corporation are redirected to a fund for catastrophic disaster preparedness. Creates an advisory board to advise on expenditures from the fund and on other policy improvements. Directs the advisory board to make recommendations on or before February 1, 2027.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3332

Introduced
1/21/25  
The Act changes the uses of certain moneys that the ORC receives from racing hubs. (Flesch Readability Score: 73.1). Modifies the uses for certain moneys received by the Oregon Racing Commission from Multi-Jurisdictional Simulcasting and Interactive Wagering Totalizator Hubs. Requires entities that receive distributions of such moneys to expend the moneys and report on the expenditures within a certain time period. Provides for clawback if a recipient fails to expend the moneys or report on expenditures. Provides that moneys that are clawed back be deposited in a fund for horse and jockey safety. Provides that certain moneys that the commission does not expend within a fiscal biennium are deposited in the fund.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3333

Introduced
1/21/25  
The Act creates a new income tax subtraction for teachers. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.2). Creates an Oregon personal income tax subtraction for teachers. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, and before January 1, 2032. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3334

Introduced
1/21/25  
The Act makes a new tax credit for teacher expenses. (Flesch Readability Score: 78.2). Creates an income tax credit for the unreimbursed expenses of certain public school teachers and adjunct instructors. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2025, and before January 1, 2031. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3335

Introduced
1/21/25  
This Act makes DLCD study placing solar power plants. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.1). Requires the Department of Land Conservation and Development to study land use siting of renewable energy facilities that are solar photovoltaic power generating facilities and submit findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to land use no later than September 15, 2026.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3336

Introduced
1/21/25  
Refer
1/24/25  
Report Pass
4/4/25  
Engrossed
4/14/25  
Makes a power company file with the PUC a plan for using grid enhancing technologies where doing so is cost-effective. Requires the plan to be updated every two years. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.8). Declares a state policy regarding the electric transmission system. Requires an electric company to file with the Public Utility Commission a strategic plan for using grid enhancing technologies where doing so is cost-effective. Requires the plan to be updated every two years. Requires an electric company to carry out the electric company's first filed strategic plan not later than January 1, 2030. Requires an electric company to conduct a cost-effectiveness and timetable analysis of multiple strategies when proposing additions, improvements or modifications to a transmission system. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3337

Introduced
1/21/25  
Makes changes to the highway worker photo radar laws. (Flesch Readability Score: 66.1). Makes changes to the highway worker photo radar laws.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3338

Introduced
1/28/25  
The Act tells HERC to review treatments that affirm gender. (Flesch Readability Score: 69.7). Directs the Health Evidence Review Commission to evaluate gender-affirming treatment. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3339

Introduced
1/28/25  
The Act makes Oregon join a compact with other states to let psychologists work across state lines. (Flesch Readability Score: 65.1). Enacts the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact. Allows the Oregon Board of Psychology to disclose specified information to the Psychology Interjurisdictional Compact Commission. Exempts individuals authorized under the Compact from the requirement to obtain a license from the board. Allows the board to use moneys to meet financial obligations imposed on the State of Oregon as a result of participation in the Compact. Becomes operative on January 1, 2027. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3340

Introduced
1/28/25  
This Act bans foreign adversaries listed by the AG from getting an interest in farm or forest lands. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.6). Requires the Attorney General to adopt and maintain a list of foreign adversaries who are ineligible to receive conveyances of farm or forest lands. Makes unauthorized conveyances void. Requires the State Department of Agriculture to create and publish an annual report relating to foreign ownership of agricultural lands and to deliver copies of the report to the Governor and to relevant interim committees of the Legislative Assembly. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
OR

Oregon 2025 Regular Session

Oregon House Bill HB3341

Introduced
1/28/25  
Refer
1/30/25  
Refer
3/5/25  
The Act gives money to OWEB for a program to protect and improve sources of drinking water. (Flesch Readability Score: 70.1). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Oregon Watershed Enhancement Board for deposit in the Community Drinking Water Enhancement and Protection Fund. Declares an emergency, effective July 1, 2025.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records