All Bills - Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB555
Introduced
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in district election officers, further providing for oath of judge of election, for oaths of inspectors of election, for oaths of clerks of election and for oath of machine inspectors.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB556
Introduced
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for registration of firearms; and imposing penalties.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB557
Introduced
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
An Act amending Title 1 (General Provisions) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of construction, further providing for legislative intent controls.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB558
Introduced
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
An Act amending Title 38 (Holidays and Observances) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for election day and for observance of Election Day as a legal holiday; and imposing a penalty.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB559
Introduced
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for definitions and for possession of firearm by minor; and making editorial changes.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB560
Introduced
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, establishing the Pennsylvania PreferredĀ® Food Bucks Program.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB561
Introduced
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in creation, alteration and termination of condominiums, providing for electric vehicle charging stations; in creation, alteration and termination of cooperatives, providing for electric vehicle charging stations; and, in creation, alteration and termination of planned communities, providing for electric vehicle charging stations.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB562
Introduced
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in compensation, further providing for benefits based on service for educational institutions.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB563
An Act amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in membership, contributions and benefits, providing for supplemental annuity commencing 2025; and, in benefits, providing for supplemental annuity commencing 2025.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB564
An Act amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in membership, contributions and benefits, providing for supplemental annuity commencing 2025; and, in benefits, providing for supplemental annuity commencing 2025.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB565
Introduced
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
An Act amending Titles 24 (Education) and 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in membership, contributions and benefits, providing for supplemental annuity commencing 2025 and for supplemental annuity commencing 2026; and, in benefits, providing for supplemental annuity commencing 2025 and for supplemental annuity commencing 2026.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB566
Introduced
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for application.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB568
Introduced
4/4/25
Refer
4/4/25
An Act providing for the removal of nonconsenting intimate depictions from social media platforms.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB569
Introduced
4/9/25
Refer
4/9/25
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, establishing the Snow and Ice Removal Safety Grant Program and the Snow and Ice Removal Safety Grant Program Account; and imposing duties on the Department of Transportation.
PA
Pennsylvania 2025-2026 Regular Session
Pennsylvania Senate Bill SB570
Introduced
4/11/25
Refer
4/11/25
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for End of Life Options Act; imposing duties on the Department of Health; and imposing penalties.