All Bills - Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0775
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $2,500,000 To The Haus Of Codec (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $2,500,000 To The Haus Of Codec To Support Unhoused Members Of The Lgbtq+ Community Through Transitional Housing, Workforce Training, Mental Health Support, And Daily Nutrition.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0776
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Report Pass
6/15/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
Enrolled
6/16/23
Passed
6/22/23
Enables the city of East Providence to offer tax amnesty for two (2) separate sixty (60) day periods for fiscal years 2023 and 2024 for waiver of interest and penalties on overdue tangible tax payments and motor vehicle tax payments.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0777
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Report Pass
4/4/23
Passed
4/25/23
Senate Resolution Reinstating The Life Of And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Analyze And Make Recommendations Regarding Tax Exempt Properties In The State Of Rhode Island (this Resolution Reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Analyze And Make Recommendations Regarding Tax Exempt Properties, From April 1, 2022, To July 1, 2023, And Would Expire On August 31, 2023.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0778
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Creates the Rhode Island Women’s Equity Incentive Act of 2023 offering tax credits up to $3,500 per employee per year to eligible businesses.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0779
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Establishes a core state behavioral health crisis services system, to be administered by the director of behavioral healthcare, developmental disabilities and hospitals.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0780
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Improves educational attainment related outcomes for current former foster youth at the post-secondary level from 14 yrs. to 21 years up to 26 years of age under certain circumstances from funds appropriated by the general assembly.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0781
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Adjusts the state's monthly share of Supplemental Security Income to equal the federal Supplemental Security Income benefit in January of that calendar year.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0782
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Appropriates two hundred million dollars ($200,000,000) for home and community based providers of health and human services to provide a ten percent (10%) rate increase to providers.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0783
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Provides that services provided by graduate student interns who work under a supervisory protocol would be eligible to be paid from Medicaid reimbursement.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0784
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Increases the hourly compensation for "individual providers" from no less than sixteen dollars ($16.00) on April 1, 2023, and gradually increase several times until June 30, 2024, when it would be nineteen dollars ($19.00) and continuing.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0785
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Creates a restricted receipt account wherein fifteen percent (15%) of revenue collected from the gasoline tax shall be deposited into the account each year and used for the implementation of capital improvements on local public ways in each municipality.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0786
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Establishes ongoing two percent (2%) regionalization bonus to Education Equity and Property Tax Relief Act.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0787
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Report Pass
6/8/23
Engrossed
6/13/23
Enrolled
6/14/23
Passed
6/24/23
Allows Bristol to adopt tax classification plan for tax relief for taxes assessed on 12/31/23 and any tax year thereafter.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0788
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Allows a municipality to set its own conveyance tax rate for residential properties sold in excess of $800,000.00 at $10 per $500. Provides collected taxes to be in a restricted account and distributed within 2 years for affordable housing.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island Senate Bill S0789
Introduced
3/23/23
Refer
3/23/23
Report Pass
5/30/23
Engrossed
6/6/23
Enrolled
6/12/23
Passed
6/19/23
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Sojourner House, a Rhode Island nonprofit corporation.