All Bills - Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6335
Introduced
4/26/23
Refer
4/26/23
Report Pass
5/30/23
Engrossed
6/1/23
Enrolled
6/6/23
Passed
6/12/23
In accordance with ยง 16-7-44 approving the issuance of $1,000,000 bonds by the town of Scituate to finance a water project at the Scituate high school/middle school.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6336
Introduced
4/27/23
Passed
4/27/23
House Resolution Proclaiming May Of 2023, To Be "motorcycle Awareness Month" In The State Of Rhode Island And Urging All Rhode Island Motorists To Avoid Distracted Driving
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6337
Introduced
4/27/23
Passed
4/27/23
House Resolution Recognizing The 75th Anniversary Of Israel's Establishment On April 25-26, 2023, And Reaffirming The Bonds Of Friendship And Cooperation Between Rhode Island, The United States, And The State Of Israel
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6338
Introduced
4/27/23
Passed
4/27/23
House Resolution Expressing Condolences
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6339
Introduced
4/27/23
Passed
4/27/23
House Resolution Extending Congratulations
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6340
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Provides for the operation and duties of natural organic reduction for the contained, accelerated conversion of human remains to soil. A disposition facility would be used for either cremation or natural organic reduction.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6341
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Report Pass
5/16/23
Passed
6/12/23
House Resolution Reinstating And Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes (reinstates The Life And Extends The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Commission To Study Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes From April 4, 2019, To April 4, 2024, And Would Expire On June 4, 2024.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6342
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Report Pass
6/7/23
Passed
6/12/23
House Resolution Creating A Legislative Study Commission To Evaluate And Provide Recommendations On Proper Forest Management For Fire Prevention (creates A 12 Member Commission To Evaluate And Provide Recommendations On Proper Forest Management For Fire Prevention, And Who Would Report Back To The House By February 28, 2024, And Expire On April 30, 2024.)
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6343
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Grants leave of up to three (3) days per month to menstruating employees.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6344
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Mandates that the work week be reduced to thirty-two hours and rate of pay for a thirty-two (32) hour workweek would remain the same as the rate of pay for forty hours.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6345
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Report Pass
6/8/23
Engrossed
6/12/23
Enrolled
6/14/23
Passed
6/23/23
Authorizes the town of South Kingstown to locating within 200' from the premises of schools or places of worship any retailers' Class BV license, allowing retailer to be located at 357 Main St of the applicable town of South Kingstown tax assessment map.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6346
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Amends the student success factor calculation of the state share ratio for foundation aid by accounting for English language in determining the state's share of foundation aid eligibility for each school district.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6347
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Requires the division of motor vehicles to develop a form for registration of and a license plate for commercial fishing motor vehicles.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6348
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Report Pass
6/13/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
Engrossed
6/15/23
Passed
6/20/23
Legalize iGaming by patrons located in the State of Rhode Island. Effective 3/1/2024.
RI
Rhode Island 2023 Regular Session
Rhode Island House Bill H6349
Introduced
4/28/23
Refer
4/28/23
Joint Resolution To Amend The Medicaid Section 1115 Demonstration Waiver Request (provides Legislative Approval For A Proposal To Amend A Medicaid Section 1115 Waiver Request.)