All Bills - Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR280

Congratulating Pete Jaramillo on being named the 2016 Man of the Year by the Progress Times and the Greater Mission Chamber of Commerce.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR281

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Matagorda County Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR282

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Community College Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR283

Recognizing February 14, 2017, as Rita L. Littlefield Kidney Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR284

Commemorating the 50th anniversary of the Texas A&M Veterinary Medical Diagnostic Laboratory.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR285

Congratulating Melvin and Ruby Wegwerth of Robinson on their 65th wedding anniversary.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR286

Congratulating Walter and Ruth Drake of Waco on their 50th wedding anniversary.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR287

Honoring Representative Toni Rose on the occasion of her birthday.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR288

Welcoming the Sweetwater Jaycees to the State Capitol for their Rattlesnake Roundup.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR289

Recognizing February 21, 2017, as Mission Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR29

Recognizing March 3, 2017, as National Speech and Debate Education Day in Texas.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR290

Recognizing February 16, 2017, as Nacogdoches-SFA Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR291

Honoring Representative Toni Rose on the occasion of her birthday.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR292

Honoring the memory and sacrifice of the heroes of the Alamo.
TX

Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HR293

Recognizing February 7, 2017, as Child Protection and Home Visiting Day at the State Capitol.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records