Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Appropriations Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/19/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Finance
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Finance
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H No action taken in committee
04/17/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/23/2023
HB1
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/20/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately