Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Culture, Recreation & Tourism Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/18/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
05/11/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
04/27/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/20/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
04/13/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Finance
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
04/06/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
03/30/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/23/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Considered in Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
03/16/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar