Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Elections Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/04/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
04/27/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/18/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
04/20/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
04/13/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/04/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/30/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 S Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Returned to committee: May 8 2023 5:08PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
03/23/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/16/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/18/2023 S Referred to State Affairs