Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Environmental Regulation Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/10/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
05/04/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H No action taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
04/20/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
04/13/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
03/30/2023
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
03/23/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 03/23/2023 H Left pending in committee