Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Administration Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/11/2023
04/27/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 8 2023 9:17AM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:39PM
04/12/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee