Date
Event
Location
05/10/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
04/25/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
04/18/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
04/11/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
04/04/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/28/2023 S Returned from the House for further action
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Local Government
03/28/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Co-sponsor authorized
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Administration
03/21/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23