Date
Event
Location
04/26/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/19/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/19/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/12/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
04/05/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 H Left pending in committee
03/29/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
03/22/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 H Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/29/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
03/15/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 03/15/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor