Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

House Natural Resources Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/16/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
05/09/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
05/02/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
04/25/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Received from the House
04/18/2023
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 6 2023 3:15PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Finance
04/11/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
04/04/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/04/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
03/28/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
03/21/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23