Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Senate Subcommittee on Higher Education Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/20/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: May 17 2023 4:04PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: May 10 2023 1:53AM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: May 16 2023 2:34PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
04/13/2023
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: Apr 28 2023 2:39PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 04/17/2023 S Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: May 6 2023 3:49PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: Apr 27 2023 6:39PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/21/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
04/06/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Introduced
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 17 2023 11:29AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
03/30/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/23/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Referred to Higher Education: Apr 24 2023 7:06PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 03/23/2023 S Left pending in subcommittee