Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

House Corrections Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/30/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/30/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
04/16/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/16/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/09/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
04/02/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
03/26/2025
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House