Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

House S/C on International Relations Committee Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/28/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 9:51PM
04/28/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 7 2025 9:51PM
04/14/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
04/14/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
03/24/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Placed on Resolutions Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Received from the House